EP1846138 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PURIFYING COMBUSTION GASES OF IMPURITIES CONTAINED IN THE COMBUSTION GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSJ Holding Oy Vellamontie 21 As 6 04230 Kerava / FI | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄRVENPÄÄ, Viljo Vellamontie 21 As 6 FI-04230 Kerava / FI | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06708888.0 | 03.02.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006FI00029 | Priority number, date | FI20050000141 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: FI 20050141 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082277 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846138 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D47/06, B01D53/50, C02F1/24, F01N3/04 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B01D47/06 (EP,US);
B01D47/14 (EP,US);
C02F1/24 (EP,US);
F01N13/004 (EP,US);
F01N3/04 (EP,US);
B01D2247/04 (EP,US);
B01D2247/101 (EP,US);
B01D2247/107 (EP,US);
B03D1/02 (EP,US);
C02F2101/32 (EP,US);
C02F2103/008 (EP,US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | B01D47/06, B01D53/50, C02F1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON VERBRENNUNGSGASEN IN BEZUG AUF DARIN ENTHALTENE VERUNREINIGUNGEN | [2007/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PURIFYING COMBUSTION GASES OF IMPURITIES CONTAINED IN THE COMBUSTION GASES | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PURIFIER DES GAZ DE COMBUSTION DES IMPURETES CONTENUES DANS LESDITS GAZ | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 28.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005016937 (SMULLIN JOSEPH I [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0025] - [0031] - [0049] , [0050]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]JP2004089770 (TASHIRO MASANORI) [X] 1-15 * pages 25-27; figures 1,8 *; | JP2004089770 [ ]; | [A]GB1490718 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4964885 (WIESER-LINHART JOHANNES [AT]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9907983 (SMULLIN CORP [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 32, Database accession no. 2004-343067, & JP2004089770 A 20040325 (TASHIRO M) [ ] * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2004197624 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]GB306043 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | [Y]GB165144 (FRANK BUTLER JONES, et al); | [Y]US6759019 (SHIRAISHI KOUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US5690899 (MAKKINEJAD NAVID DR ING [DE], et al) |