EP1875209 - Fluorescence imaging device with two wavelength reflection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/02] | FLUORESCENCE IMAGING DEVICE WITH TWO WAVELENGTH REFLECTION | ||
[2013/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELTIE, Philippe Vers Le Mont F-38760 Saint Paul De Varces / FR | 02 /
BERGER, Michel 14, rue Lapouya, Cossey F-38640 Claix / FR | 03 /
SAUZE, Roland 1, rue Charles Testoud F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 04 /
BONNET, Stéphane 20 rue de Pacalaire F-38170 Seyssinet / FR | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Cabinet HECKE 10 Rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2008/02] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Cabinet Hecké World Trade Center - Europole 5, place Robert Schuman B.P. 1537 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06709135.5 | 20.01.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006FR00131 | Priority number, date | FR20050001471 | 14.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501471 | [2008/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006087437 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1875209 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1875209 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, A61B1/06 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A61B1/0655 (EP);
G01N21/64 (US);
A61B1/00186 (EP,US);
A61B1/043 (EP,US);
A61B1/0638 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/18] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fluoreszenzabbildungsvorrichtung mit Reflexion bei zwei Wellenlängen | [2013/36] | English: | Fluorescence imaging device with two wavelength reflection | [2013/36] | French: | Dispositif d`imagerie de fluorescence par reflexion a deux longueurs d`onde | [2013/36] |
Former [2008/02] | FLUORESZENZABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ZWEI-WELLENLÄNGEN-REFLEXION | ||
Former [2008/02] | FLUORESCENCE IMAGING DEVICE WITH TWO WAVELENGTH REFLECTION | ||
Former [2008/02] | DISPOSITIF D`IMAGERIE DE FLUORESCENCE PAR REFLEXION A DEUX LONGUEURS D`ONDE | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.03.2014 | [2015/18] | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000292353 ; | [A]JP2001128927 ; | [A]US5205291 (POTTER WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-112 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5741648 (HEMSTREET GEORGE P III [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figure 20 *; | [A]US2003158470 (WOLTERS ROLF HOLGER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [X] - TANHUANPAA K ET AL, "Fluorescence imaging of pyrene-labeled lipids in living cells", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR CELL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000920), vol. 1497, no. 3, ISSN 0167-4889, pages 308 - 320, XP004278179 [X] 1-12 * page 310 - page 312 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4889(00)00068-9 | [X] - TROY T ET AL, "Quantitative comparison of the sensitivity of detection of fluorescent and bioluminescent reporters in animal models", MOLECULAR IMAGING MIT PRESS USA, (200401), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1535-3508, pages 9 - 23, XP009049182 [X] 1-12 * page 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/153535004773861688 | [A] - SZOELLOESI J ET AL, "AUTOFLUORESCENCE CORRECTION FOR FLUORESCENCE IN SITU HYBRIDIZATION", CYTOMETRY, ALAN LISS, NEW YORK, US, (1995), vol. 20, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 356 - 361, XP001074135 [A] 1-12 * page 357 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.990200412 | [A] - WAN WADE K ET AL, "Measurement of drug distribution in vascular tissue using quantitative fluorescence microscopy", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (199908), vol. 88, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 822 - 829, XP002332297 [A] 1-12 * page 827 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js9803858 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000292353 A 20001020 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001128927 A 20010515 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - TASSETTI V ET AL, "In vivo laser-induced fluorescence imaging of a rat pancreatic cancer with pheophorbide-a", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 65, no. 6, ISSN 0031-8655, pages 997 - 1006, XP009049184 [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-1097.1997.tb07960.x |