EP1844376 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PILOTING A PITCHING AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse Cédex / FR | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELANNOY, Stéphane 847, route de Fontenilles F-32600 Pujaudran / FR | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Hauer, Bernard Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Hauer, Bernard Cabinet Bonnétat 29, Rue de Saint-Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06709204.9 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006FR00209 | Priority number, date | FR20050001122 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501122 | [2007/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006082305 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844376 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844376 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/08 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G05D1/0825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FLIEGEN EINES SICH AUFBÄUMENDEN FLUGZEUGS | [2008/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PILOTING A PITCHING AIRCRAFT | [2007/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PILOTAGE D'UN AVION EN TANGAGE | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/42] | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM FLIEGEN EINES KIPPENDEN FLUGZEUGS | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 25.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | LT | 03.12.2008 | LV | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BE | 31.01.2009 | LU | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | BG | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | IS | 03.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
LU | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
LU | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 03.12.2008 | |
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1288437 (NORTH AMERICAN AVIATION INC) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]DE2162349 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US3963197 (OBERLERCHNER ERHARD) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2617319 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5112009 (FARINEAU JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 42 * * figures 1-4 * |