EP1843804 - IMPROVEMENS TO PONCTURE TIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/42] | IMPROVEMENS TO PONCTURE TIPS AND CATHETER TUBES | ||
[2010/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vygon 5. rue Adeline 95440 Ecouen / FR | [2011/10] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Vygon S.A. 5 rue Adeline F-95440 Ecouen / FR | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states VYGON 5 rue Adeline F-95440 Ecouen / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARREZ, Jean-Luc 15, rue Jean-Jaurès F-95440 Ecouen / FR | 02 /
DALLE, Valéry 8, Boucle d'en-Haut F-60270 Gouvieux / FR | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06709223.9 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006FR00231 | Priority number, date | FR20050001072 | 03.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501072 | [2007/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082314 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843804 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843804 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/14, A61L31/14 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
A61M25/0606 (EP,US);
A61L27/14 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61M5/3286 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/19] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN VON SPRITZENKANÜLEN | [2010/52] | English: | IMPROVEMENS TO PONCTURE TIPS | [2010/52] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS AUX EMBOUTS DE PONCTION | [2010/52] |
Former [2007/42] | VERBESSERUNGEN VON SPRITZENKANÜLEN UND KATHETERROHREN | ||
Former [2007/42] | IMPROVEMENS TO PONCTURE TIPS AND CATHETER TUBES | ||
Former [2007/42] | PERFECTIONNEMENTS AUX EMBOUTS DE PONCTION ET AUX TUBES CATHETERS | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000354626 ; | [X]JP2003205036 ; | [DY]WO8603980 (THORATEC LAB CORP [US]) [DY] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 11 * * page 3, line 3 - line 29 * * page 5, line 19 - line 33 * * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 5 *; | [X]EP0529675 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 10 - line 45 * * column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 5 * * claims 1-13 *; | [DX]WO9508296 (KIM YOUNG KON [KR], et al) [DX] 1-4,8-12 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 1 * * page 4, line 2 - line 40 * * claims 1-14 *; | [X]GB2327614 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2809625 (USSEL BERNARD D [FR]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DXY]WO02085188 (KAPLAN EDWARD J [US]) [DX] 1-4,8-12 * page 6, line 18 - line 32 * * page 12, line 19 - line 29 * * claim 1 * * figures 4B,8A * [Y] 1-12; | [X]US2003120308 (LOUBENS THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005077279 (ECLECTIC GREY MATER DESIGNS LL [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * page 5, paragraph 16 * * page 6, paragraph 22 * * page 7, paragraph 31 ** claims 1-36 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000354626 A 20001226 (TAKEZAWA SHINGO; NIKKISO CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003205036 A 20030722 (UNIV NIHON; IR:KK) [X] 1 * abstract * |