EP1839293 - System for applying labels to articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | IMPROVEMENTS TO LABELS AND APPLICATION APPARATUS THEREFOR | ||
[2022/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 8080 Norton Parkway Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [2023/02] |
Former [2023/01] | For all designated states Avery Dennison Materials Europe B.V. Willem Einthovenstraat 11 2342 BH Oegstgeest / NL | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Catchpoint Ltd. 49 Park Place Leeds LS1 2SY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADE, Richard, @"Oakwood", The view Roundhay Leeds LS8 1JL / GB | 02 /
COOPER, Michael John 1 Brook Lodge, 28 Lexden Road , Colchester Essex C03 3QD / GB | 03 /
BARWOOD, Kevin 63 Gravel Hill Way, Dovercourt Essex CO12 4UN / GB | [2023/02] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
WADE, Richard, "Oakwood", The view Roundhay Leeds LS8 1JL / GB | ||
02 /
COOPER, Michael John 1 Brook Lodge, 28 Lexden Road , Colchester Essex C03 3QD / GB | |||
03 /
BARWOOD, Kevin 63 Gravel Hill Way, Dovercourt Essex CO12 4UN / GB | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2023/02] |
Former [2007/40] | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place GB-Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06709566.1 | 23.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006GB00226 | Priority number, date | GB20050001369 | 22.01.2005 Original published format: GB 0501369 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006077434 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1839293 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1839293 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/18, G09F3/02 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G09F3/0292 (EP,US);
B65C9/1896 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1339 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1734 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1746 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | G09F3/10, G09F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zum Anbringen von Etiketten an Gegenständen | [2022/19] | English: | System for applying labels to articles | [2022/19] | French: | Système d'application d'étiquettes à des objets | [2022/19] |
Former [2007/40] | VERBESSERUNGEN AN LABELS UND ANWENDUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/40] | IMPROVEMENTS TO LABELS AND APPLICATION APPARATUS THEREFOR | ||
Former [2007/40] | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES ETIQUETTES ET APPAREIL D'APPLICATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.04.2022 | 12.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2019 | 31.01.2021 | 16   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | IE | 23.01.2023 | LU | 23.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
IE | 23.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 23.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 11.01.2023 | |
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 11.01.2023 | |
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5172936 (SULLIVAN BRIAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 47 - line 50 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [YA]EP0673839 (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]) [Y] 10-12,15,16 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 10 - line 17 * * column 2, line 23 - line 34 * * column 4, line 6 - line 57 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 6 * * claims 1-5,10,13,15 * * figure 1 * [A] 13,14,17-22,40-48; | [XAY]US5536546 (NASH THOMAS P [US]) [X] 1-4,23,49,50 * column 3, line 33 - line 46 * * column 3, line 57 * * column 4, line 18 - line 24 * * claims 1,11 * * figures 1,5 * [A] 26 [Y] 37,51; | [A]US5540369 (BOREALI JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 10-22,40-48 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 44 *; | [XYA]US5711836 (HILL GERALD CHRISTOPHER PAUL [GB]) [X] 52 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 35 - line 56 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 53,54 [A] 53,54; | [YA]US5874142 (HOFFMANN DONALD J [US]) [Y] 18-22 * figures 1,2,8,9,16 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 1 * * column 5, line 21 - line 35 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 27 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 2 * [A] 10-17,19,20,40-48; | [Y]US6066437 (KOESSLINGER ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 51 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 62 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US6074747 (SCHOLZ WILLIAM F [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 22, line 1 - line 12 * * column 22, line 22 - line 41 * * column 22, line 66, paragraph 67 * * claim 1 * * figure 5 * [A] 27,36; | [A]NL1014737C (ESHUIS MARK [NL]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [Y]US2001038204 (NOJIMA MICHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 53,54 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0040] , [0046] * * claim 5 ** figures 1,3 *; | [YA]US2003035014 (ADAMS MATTHEW THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 37 * paragraph [0016] * * claims 1,13 * * figure 2 * [A] 38,39,49-51; | [A]US2003124345 (FAUST MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 10-22,40-48 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0047] - [0052] * * claims 1,2,20,21 *; | [XDAY]WO2004005141 (STEPPING STONES INVEST LTD [GB], et al) [XD] 17,40,41,44,47,48 * figures 3-6 * * page 5, line 14 - line 17 * * page 6, line 16 - line 29 * * page 7, line 11 - line 27 * * claims 1-3,6 * [A] 1-9,11-16,19,20,23-39,42,43,45,46,49-54 [Y] 10-12,15,16,18-22; | [A]US2004033876 (VIJUK JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 5 * | Examination | EP0921073 | by applicant | EP0673839 | US5536546 | GB2405396 |