EP1850723 - BRACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evans, John Anthony 72, Derlwyn, Dunvant Swansea, SA2 7QE / GB | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06709925.9 | 27.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006GB00700 | Priority number, date | GB20050004010 | 26.02.2005 Original published format: GB 0504010 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006090186 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850723 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/26 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A47K13/26 (EP);
A47K13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHLAG | [2007/45] | English: | BRACKET | [2007/45] | French: | PATTE DE FIXATION | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2004000029 (MILLER HARRY R [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10-12,14 * page 1, paragraph 21 - page 2, paragraph 28; figures 1-4,6-15 * [A] 9; | [XA]US4173802 (WIKSTROM KARL-ERIK [SE]) [X] 1-3,8-10,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 4,13; | [XAY]GB2309040 (LU PIEN RUENG [TW]) [X] 1,4-6,10,12,14 * page 2, paragraph 8 - page 5, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,9,13 [Y] 7; | [X]GB2389144 (LIN CHI-FU [TW]) [X] 1,4,5,11,12,14 * page 4, line 1 - page 4, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR74515E (LOUIS-CHARLES VAN HOOREN) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB565172 (JOHN ERNEST FOX, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,10,12,14 * page 3, line 124 - page 5, line 19; figure - * | by applicant | US4173802 |