EP1856607 - REAL TIME PAGED COMPUTING DEVICE AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbian Software Limited 2-6 Boundary Row London SE1 8HP / GB | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOELKE, Andrew Symbian Software Limited, 2-6 Boundary Row London SE1 8HP / GB | 02 /
MAY, Dennis Symbian Software Limited, 2-6 Boundary Row London SE1 8HP / GB | [2007/47] | Application number, filing date | 06709942.4 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006GB00718 | Priority number, date | GB20050004325 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: GB 0504325 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092587 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1856607 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1856607 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F12/12 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G06F12/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT EINER ECHTZEIT-SEITENVERWALTUNG DES SPEICHERS UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2008/07] | English: | REAL TIME PAGED COMPUTING DEVICE AND METHOD OF OPERATION | [2007/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE A MOUVEMENT DE PAGES EN TEMPS REEL ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/47] | DATENVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT ECHTZEIT-FUNKRUF UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 30.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2008 | BE | 03.09.2008 | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | LT | 03.09.2008 | LV | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | PL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | IS | 03.01.2009 | PT | 03.02.2009 | IE | 01.03.2009 | LU | 01.03.2009 | HU | 04.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 01.03.2009 | ||
LU | 01.03.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 01.03.2009 | ||
LU | 01.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 01.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 01.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
IE | 01.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5913224 (MACDONALD JAMES R [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A] - STEINMETZ R, "ANALYZING THE MULTIMEDIA OPERATING SYSTEM", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950321), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1070-986X, pages 68 - 84, XP000500087 [A] 1-23 * page 81, right-hand column, section "Memory management", paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/93.368605 | [A] - EDY BERTOLISSI ET AL, "Java in Real-time Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199808), vol. 45, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 1965 - 1972, XP011041360 [A] 1-23 * page 1967, column RH, paragraph 2 * * page 1968, column RH, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.710972 | [A] - ZILKER M ET AL, "High-speed data acquisition with the Solaris and Linux operating systems", FUSION ENGINEERING AND DESIGN, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000801), vol. 48, no. 1-2, ISSN 0920-3796, pages 193 - 197, XP004212192 [A] 1-23 * page 194, column RH, paragraph 1 * * page 196, column LH, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-3796(00)00124-1 |