EP1859049 - MARKERS FOR MELANOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE DUBLIN Belfield Dublin 4 / IE | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAGHER, William, Conway Institute University Colege Dublin Dublin 4 / IE | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Matthew Peter, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Spencer, Matthew Peter, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06709980.4 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006GB00756 | Priority number, date | GB20050004302 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: GB 0504302 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006092610 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1859049 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/136 (EP);
C12Q2600/154 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MELANOMMARKER | [2007/48] | English: | MARKERS FOR MELANOMA | [2007/48] | French: | MARQUEURS DE MÉLANOME | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004031410 (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE, INC; JAPAN AS REPRESENTED BY THE PRESIDENT OF THE) [X] 21-23 * claim 22 *; | [X]WO2005005601 (THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN; CLARKE, MICHAEL, F; LIU, RU) [X] 21-23 * This document discloses microarrays having TSPY1, MTA2, and CYBA . *; | [A]WO0141815 (WHITEHEAD INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH; MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE O) [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | [DX] - SERRANO ALFONSO ET AL, "Expression of HLA class I antigens and restoration of antigen-specific CTL response in melanoma cells following 5-Aza-2'-deoxycytidine treatment", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20011015), vol. 94, no. 2, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 243 - 251, XP002348088 [DX] 17-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.1452 | [DX] - VAN DER VELDEN PIETER A ET AL, "Expression profiling reveals that methylation of TIMP3 is involved in uveal melanoma development.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20030910), vol. 106, no. 4, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 472 - 479, XP002389348 [DX] 17-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.11262 | [X] - JANSSEN B L M ET AL, "TRANSCRIPTION OF THE MAGE-1 GENE AND THE METHYLATION STATUS OF ITS ETS BINDING PROMOTER ELEMENTS: A QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS IN MELANOMA CELL LINES USING A REAL-TIME POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION TECHNIQUE", MELANOMA RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 213 - 222, XP009029709 [X] 17-20 * the whole document * | [X] - APARICIO A ET AL, "Phase I trial of continuous infusion 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine.", CANCER CHEMOTHERAPY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (200303), vol. 51, no. 3, ISSN 0344-5704, pages 231 - 239, XP002389349 [X] 17-20 * the whole document * | [DX] - WANG ENA ET AL, "Prospective molecular profiling of melanoma metastases suggests classifiers of immune responsiveness", CANCER RESEARCH, (20020701), vol. 62, no. 13, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3581 - 3586, XP002389350 [DX] 21-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/0-306-47822-6_1 | [A] - BERGER AARON J ET AL, "Automated quantitative analysis of HDM2 expression in malignant melanoma shows association with early-stage disease and improved outcome", CANCER RESEARCH, (20041201), vol. 64, no. 23, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 8767 - 8772, XP002389352 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-1384 | [DA] - BITTNER M ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLASSIFICATION OF CUTANEOUS MALIGNANT MELANOMA BY GENE EXPRESSION PROFILING", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20000803), vol. 406, no. 6795, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 536 - 540, XP000990000 [DA] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35020115 | [DA] - CLARK E A ET AL, "Genomic analysis of metastasis reveals an essential role for RhoC", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20000803), vol. 406, no. 6795, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 532 - 535, XP002333028 [DA] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35020106 | Examination | - DASARI ET AL, "DNA METHYLATION REGULATES THE EXPRESSION OF Y CHROMOSOME SPECIFIC GENES IN PROSTATE CANCER", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20020101), vol. 167, no. 1, pages 335 - 338, XP005543608 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5347(05)65464-X |