EP1856856 - ROUTE SELECTION IN MULTI-HOP CELLULAR NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2009/47] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London, Greater London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAPPU, Benjamin 7 Jeavons Lane, Kesgrave Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 2EB / GB | 02 /
TAY, Hui Min June 33 St Martins Court, Bugsby Way, Kesgrave Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 2WW / GB | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Nash, Roger William, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Nash, Roger William, et al British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department PPC5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London, EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06710001.6 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006GB00780 | Priority number, date | EP20050251348 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05251348 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095148 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1856856 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1856856 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
H04W40/22 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0239 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROUTENAUSWAHL IN EINEM ZELLULAREN MEHRSTROMNETZWERK | [2007/47] | English: | ROUTE SELECTION IN MULTI-HOP CELLULAR NETWORK | [2007/47] | French: | SELECTION DE ROUTES DANS UN RESEAU CELLULAIRE MULTISAUT | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.2009 | BE | 30.12.2009 | CY | 30.12.2009 | CZ | 30.12.2009 | DK | 30.12.2009 | EE | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | IT | 30.12.2009 | LT | 30.12.2009 | LV | 30.12.2009 | NL | 30.12.2009 | PL | 30.12.2009 | RO | 30.12.2009 | SE | 30.12.2009 | SI | 30.12.2009 | SK | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | IE | 03.03.2010 | LU | 03.03.2010 | BG | 30.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | ES | 10.04.2010 | IS | 30.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | HU | 01.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LU | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - HAO ZHU ET AL, "On improving the performance of IEEE 802.11 with multi-hop concepts", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, 2003. ICCCN 2003. PROCEEDINGS. THE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DALLAS, TX, USA 20-22 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031020), ISBN 0-7803-7945-4, pages 151 - 156, XP010695711 [Y] 1,4-8 * page 152, column R, line 25 - page 154, column L, line 20 * | [Y] - SRENG V ET AL, "Coveragege enhancment through two-hop relaying in cellular radio systems", THESIS, XX, XX, (2002), pages 24 - 39, XP002986110 [Y] 1,4-8 * page 29, line 3 - page 32, line 14 * | [Y] - SRENG V ET AL, "Relayer selection strategies in cellular networks with peer-to-peer relaying", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-FALL. 2003 IEEE 58TH ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-9 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20031006), ISBN 0-7803-7954-3, pages 1949 - 1953, XP010702827 [Y] 1,4-8 * page 1949, column L, line 1 - page 1950, column R, line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285365 | [A] - DOUGMEI ZHAO ET AL, "Cellular CDMA capacity improvement using ad hoc relaying", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2004. PIMRC 2004. 15TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BARCELONA, SPAIN 5-8 SEPT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040905), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8523-3, pages 719 - 723, XP010754731 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |