EP1869722 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Company Limited 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUICHIRO, Tabuchi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
YUICHIRO, Tabuchi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
YUICHIRO, Tabuchi 130 Farm Stead LN 224 State College, PA 16803 / US | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 14 03 29 80453 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 14 03 29 80453 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Intellectual Property Department Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06710511.4 | 07.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006IB00492 | Priority number, date | JP20050062218 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005062218 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006095242 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1869722 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869722 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
H01M8/04179 (EP,US);
H01M8/04291 (EP,US);
H01M8/04365 (EP,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP,US);
H01M8/04395 (EP,US);
H01M8/04731 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04835 (EP,US);
H01M8/04873 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2007/52] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2007/52] | French: | SYSTEME DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 02.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003031909 (GASCOYNE JOHN MALCOLM [GB], et al) [A] 3,15 * paragraph [0008] *; | [A]WO03098769 (GREENLIGHT POWER TECHNOLOGIES [CA], et al) [A] 1-24* paragraph [0062]; figure 6 *; | [X]US2004151956 (ORIHASHI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0043] , [0054] - [0056] * * figure 9 * |