EP1866992 - A CONTROL DEVICE AND A CONTROL METHOD FOR A FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Company Limited 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHIHIKO, Matsumoto@Guran soreiyu 103 3-16-24 Tomiokanishi, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0052 / JP | 02 /
TAKEAKI, Obata 8-17-5 Kamariya-higashi, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0042 / JP | [2017/41] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
MICHIHIKO, Matsumoto Guran soreiyu 103 3-16-24 Tomiokanishi, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0052 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEAKI, Obata 8-17-5 Kamariya-higashi, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0042 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2017/41] |
Former [2009/27] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 14 03 29 80453 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Holmes, Matthew William Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Moulsoe Road GB-Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06710578.3 | 22.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006IB00639 | Priority number, date | JP20050084789 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005084789 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006100569 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866992 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866992 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04828, H01M8/04992, H01M8/04007, H01M8/04082, H01M8/0432, H01M8/0438, H01M8/04537, H01M8/04746 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04082 (EP,US);
H01M8/04328 (EP,US);
H01M8/04358 (EP,US);
H01M8/04365 (EP,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP,US);
H01M8/04395 (EP,US);
H01M8/04425 (EP,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04589 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04761 (EP,US);
H01M8/04776 (EP,US);
H01M8/0494 (EP,US);
H01M8/04992 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | H01M8/04, H01M8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/41] |
Former [2008/27] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEUEREINRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2007/51] | English: | A CONTROL DEVICE AND A CONTROL METHOD FOR A FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2007/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2017/22] |
Former [2007/51] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTEME DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 28.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1408384 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1-34 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0020] , [0028] , [0031] , [0050] - [0059] *; | [X]WO2004059767 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1-34 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2001014414 (OKAMOTO MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * paragraph [0047] *; | [A]US2004033399 (IMAMURA TOMONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract * |