EP1984153 - ROTARY POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jinding Group Co. Ltd. No. 689 Beijing East Road Eastern Tower 9th Floor Shanghai 200001 / CN | For all designated states Bohler, Daniel Carl-Benz-Strasse 6 79211 Denzlingen / DE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHLER, Daniel Carl-Benz-Strasse 6 79211 Denzlingen / DE | 02 /
BAKKER, Rients Mathijs 905 Hua Shan Road House 3A XuHui District Shanghai, 200031 / CN | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
BOHLER, Daniel Carl-Benz-Strasse 6 79211 Denzlingen / DE | ||
02 /
BAKKER, Rients Mathijs No. 689 Beijing East Road Eastern Tower 9th Floor Shanghai, 200001 / CN | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06710918.1 | 15.02.2006 | [2008/44] | WO2006IB50500 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093857 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984153 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B27C5/10 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
B27C5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTBETRIEBENES ROTIERENDES WERKZEUG | [2008/44] | English: | ROTARY POWER TOOL | [2008/44] | French: | MACHINE OUTIL ROTATIVE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0830923 (CEKA ELEKTROWERKZEUGE AG & CO [CH]) [X] 1-3,10 * column 5, line 34 - column 8, line 9; figures 1-4 * |