EP1853908 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DETECTION OF EXPLOSIVES IN AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medis El Ltd. P.O. Box 1112 71291 Lod / IL | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILANOVSKY, Boris 4/20 Dchomey St. 91000 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
SAKIN, Alexander 11/8 Rachel Hameshururet St. 96848 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
HITERER, Jacob 6/10 Ezel St. 97854 Jerusalem / IL | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06711257.3 | 28.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006IL00275 | Priority number, date | US20050066213 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: US 66213 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006090401 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1853908 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/54 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/0057 (EP,US);
G01N27/4045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/46] | G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHER NACHWEIS VON SPRENGSTOFFEN IN DER LUFT | [2007/46] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DETECTION OF EXPLOSIVES IN AIR | [2007/46] | French: | DETECTION ELECTROCHIMIQUE D'EXPLOSIFS DANS L'AIR | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 06.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6087183 (ZAROMB SOLOMON [US]); | [X]US6565811 (ZAROMB SOLOMON [US]); | [X]US6642057 (ZAROMB SOLOMON [US]) |