EP1934945 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OBJECT RECONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2015/15] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Prime Sense Ltd. 4 Ha'sadnaot 4th Floor Hetzelia Piuach 46733 Hetzelia / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZALEVSKY, Zeev 1 Ha'Hermon Street 48560 Rosh Ha'ayin / IL | 02 /
SHPUNT, Alexander 10/7 Berlovich Street 49742 Petach Tikvah / IL | 03 /
MAIZELS, Aviad 14 Revivim Street 69354 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
GARCIA, Javier C/Rodriguez de Cepeda 48, 1 Rodriguez De Cepeda Street E-46021 Valencia / ES | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06711317.5 | 14.03.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006IL00335 | Priority number, date | US20050724903P | 11.10.2005 Original published format: US 724903 P | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007043036 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934945 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T7/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G01B11/162 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (KR);
H10B41/35 (US);
G01B11/2441 (US);
G01B11/2513 (EP,US);
G06T17/05 (KR);
G06T7/521 (EP,US);
H01L23/528 (US);
H01L23/535 (US);
H01L29/0688 (US);
H01L29/42328 (US);
H01L29/788 (US);
H04N13/20 (EP,US);
H04N13/254 (EP,US);
H10B41/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | G06T17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OBJEKTREKONSTRUKTION | [2008/26] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OBJECT RECONSTRUCTION | [2008/26] | French: | METHODE ET SYSTEME POUR LA RECONSTRUCTION D'UN OBJET | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003057972 (PFAFF PAUL [US], et al); | [Y]US2004174770 (REES FRANK L [US]) |