EP1866283 - 4-FLUOROPHENYL-DERIVATIVES OF 1-{[1,5 -BIS (4-CHLOROPHENYL) -2-METHYL-1H-PYRROL-3-YL]METHYL} -4- METHYLPIPERAZINE, SYNTHESIS PROCESS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universita' Degli Studi di Siena 55, Via Banchi di Sotto I-53100 Siena / IT | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIAVA, Mariangela c/o Università degli Studi di Roma "La Sapienza" P.le Aldo Moro,5 I-00185 Roma / IT | 02 /
MANETTI, Fabrizio Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
DEIDDA, Delia Via del Re, 101 I-40018 Gavaseto, San Pietro in Casale (BO), ITALY / IT | 04 /
POMPEI, Raffaello Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | 05 /
BOTTA, Maurizio Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | 06 /
PORRETTA, Giulio, Cesare c/o Università degli Studi di Roma "La Sapienza" P.le Aldo Moro,5 I-00185 Roma / IT | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
BIAVA, Mariangela Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | ||
02 /
MANETTI, Fabrizio Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | |||
03 /
DEIDDA, Delia Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | |||
04 /
POMPEI, Raffaello Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | |||
05 /
BOTTA, Maurizio Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | |||
06 /
PORRETTA, Giulio, Cesare Università degli Studi di Siena Via Banchi di Sotto, 55 I-53100 Siena / IT | Representative(s) | Capasso, Olga, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Capasso, Olga, et al de Simone & Partners S.p.A. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 06711446.2 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006IT00131 | Priority number, date | IT2005RM00094 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: IT RM20050094 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006092822 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866283 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/32, A61K31/402, A61P31/06 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
C07D207/335 (EP,US);
A61P31/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 4-FLUORPHENYLDERIVATE VON 1-{[1,5 -BIS(4-CHLORPHENYL)-2-METHYL-1H-PYRROL-3-YL]METHYL}-4-METHYLPIPERAZIN, SYNTHESEVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2007/51] | English: | 4-FLUOROPHENYL-DERIVATIVES OF 1-{[1,5 -BIS (4-CHLOROPHENYL) -2-METHYL-1H-PYRROL-3-YL]METHYL} -4- METHYLPIPERAZINE, SYNTHESIS PROCESS AND USES THEREOF | [2007/51] | French: | DERIVES DE 1-{[1,5-BIS(4-CHLOROPHENYL)-2-METHYL-1H-PYRROL-3-YL]METHYL}-4- EETHYLPIPERAZINE, SYNTHESE ET UTILISATIONS | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/30] | 20.03.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP09176606.3 / EP2172451 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.2009 | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62178590 ; | [IDY] - BIAVA M ET AL, "Antimycobacterial compounds. Optimization of the BM 212 structure, the lead compound for a new pyrrole derivative class", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (2005), vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1221 - 1230, XP004776026 [ID] 1-18 * available online: 02-12-2004;;; compounds 25-30 * [Y] 1,5-8,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2004.11.018 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880127), vol. 012, no. 028, Database accession no. (C - 471), & JP62178590 A 19870805 (TOYAMA CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,5-8,11,12 * abstract * | [Y] - WERMUTH ET AL, "The Practise of Medicinal Chemistry", PRACTICE OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), pages 203 - 237, XP002190259 [Y] 1,5-8,11,12 * page 211 * |