EP1845286 - POWER TRANSMISSION CHAIN AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADA, Seiji c/o JTEKT Corporation, 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5428502 / JP | 02 /
KAMAMOTO, Shigeo c/o JTEKT Corporation, 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5428502 / JP | [2016/08] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
TADA, Seiji c/o JTEKT Corporation, 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C huo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5428502 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMAMOTO, Shigeo c/o JTEKT Corporation, 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C huo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5428502 / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2007/42] | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713036.9 | 03.02.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006JP301893 | Priority number, date | JP20050029574 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005029574 | JP20050301033 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005301033 | [2007/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082937 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845286 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845286 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1845286 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/18, F16G13/06 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
F16G13/06 (EP,KR,US);
F16G5/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/46] |
Former [2008/20] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSKETTE UND KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/42] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION CHAIN AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2007/42] | French: | CHAINE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2007 | Translation filed | 04.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 30.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.11.2015 | GB | 11.02.2016 | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/21] | IT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2195165 (REIMERS GETRIEBE AG) [A] 13 * figure 2 * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 1 *; | [X]JPS63201248U (NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.) [X] 1-2 * figures 2-3 *; | [A]EP0643240 (PIV ANTRIEB REIMERS KG WERNER [DE]) [A] 1,15-16 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]DE4429223 (RATTUNDE MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,7-8,15-20 * claims 1-4 * * column 2, line 37 - line 54 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US6432011 (KANEHIRA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 2 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 27 *; | [XP]EP1555455 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [XP] 1-8,12,14-23 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0119] * * figures 5-6,15-17 *; | [EL]EP1688640 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,7-8,15-19,22-23 * figures 1-2 * * claims 1,2,6 * * priority *[L] 1-4,7-8,15-19,22-23; | [EL]EP1698800 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,7-8,15-20,22-23 * claims 1,2,3,6 * * figure 13 * * figures 7,8 * * Priority * [L] 1-3,7-8,15-20,22-23 |