EP1847724 - UNIVERSAL JOINT AND IMAGE DISPLAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCALAR CORP. 10-5, Itabashi 2-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0004 / JP | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Masao c/o SCALAR CORPORATION, 10-5, Itabashi 2-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo, 1730004 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street GB-London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06713045.0 | 30.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006JP301902 | Priority number, date | JP20050022217 | 28.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005022217 | [2007/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080569 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847724 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/10, H04N5/64 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
G02B27/0176 (EP,US);
F16M11/14 (EP,US);
F16M13/04 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARDANGELENK UND BILDANZEIGEEINHEIT | [2007/43] | English: | UNIVERSAL JOINT AND IMAGE DISPLAY UNIT | [2007/43] | French: | JOINT UNIVERSEL ET UNITE D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2007 | Translation filed | 28.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 21.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63260738 (KANETSU KOGYO) [A] 1,7-9* the whole document *; | [XI]FR2698135 (THIEBAUT ALBERT [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * figure 3 * * page 5, line 28 - line 34 * [I] 6,10,11; | [A]US6431705 (LINDEN HARRY A [US]) [A] 10,11 * figures 2-4 * * column 5, line 14 - line 18 *; | [E]EP1720058 (SCALAR CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5,10,11 * figures 16A-19 * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0147] *; | [E]EP1777953 (SCALAR CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5,10,11 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 13A-16 * |