EP1850059 - FUEL DEVICE, VEHICLE, FUEL FILLING DEVICE, AND FUEL FILLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Nobuo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Yasuyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713239.9 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006JP302096 | Priority number, date | JP20050038782 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005038782 | [2007/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087944 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850059 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/00, B60K15/03, F17C5/06, F17C13/02, B60S5/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
F17C5/007 (EP,US);
F17C13/00 (KR);
B60K15/00 (EP,US);
B60K15/03 (KR);
B60S5/02 (KR);
F17C13/02 (KR);
F17C5/06 (EP,US);
F17C7/00 (EP,US);
B60K2015/0319 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2225/036 (EP,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0105 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0178 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/21] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFVORRICHTUNG, BRENNSTOFFFÜLLVORRICHTUNG UND BRENNSTOFFFÜLLSYSTEM | [2007/44] | English: | FUEL DEVICE, VEHICLE, FUEL FILLING DEVICE, AND FUEL FILLING SYSTEM | [2007/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMBUSTION, VEHICULE, APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION A COMBUSTION ET SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION A COMBUSTION | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2007 | Translation filed | 15.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 12.09.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |