EP1846963 - LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT, LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Hisao c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-Ken 2430036 / JP | 02 /
SAKATA, Junichiro c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-Ken 2430036 / JP | 03 /
SEO, Satoshi c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-Ken 2430036 / JP | 04 /
IWAKI, Yuji c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-Ken 2430036 / JP | 05 /
YAMAZAKI, Shunpei c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-Ken 2430036 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstraße 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713245.6 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006JP302102 | Priority number, date | JP20050031523 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005031523 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006085538 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1846963 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50, C09K11/06, C23C14/12 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/12 (KR);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2008/20] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTELEMENT, LEUCHTBAUELEMENT UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2007/43] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT, LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPLIANCE | [2007/43] | French: | ELEMENT ELECTROLUMINESCENT, DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT, ET APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 26.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1351558 (KIDO JUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0236] - [0243]; example 6 * [I] 5; | [E]EP1624502 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [E] 1-7 * paragraphs [0142] - [0177] *; | [E]EP1865566 (KIDO JUNJI [JP], et al) [E] 1-6* paragraphs [0021] - [0052]; examples 1-4 * | Examination | US6486601 |