12.07.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.03.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2012 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
21.09.2012 |
Change - English title |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
21.09.2012 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
02.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
11.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
11.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
25.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
01.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
28.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
26.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|