EP1849448 - Syringe device and method of preparing medicine using the device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/44] | SYRINGE DEVICE AND METHOD OF PREPARING MEDICINE USING THE DEVICE | ||
[2012/43] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8650 / JP | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Norio Central Research Laboratories KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 301, Gensuke Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka, 4268646 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Yasuhiko Central Research Laboratories KAKENPHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 301, Gensuke Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka, 4268646 / JP | 03 /
SUGITA, Kouichi MAEDA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 16-20, Fukushima 8-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 55 / JP | 04 /
TAGUCHI, Katsuya MAEDA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 16-20, Fukushima 8-chome, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 55 / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Fearnside, Andrew Simon, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06713298.5 | 08.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006JP302155 | Priority number, date | JP20050033218 | 09.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005033218 | [2007/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006085546 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849448 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/05, A61J3/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
A61J1/2096 (EP);
A61J1/20 (KR);
A61J1/05 (KR);
A61J3/00 (KR);
A61M5/178 (KR);
A61J1/201 (EP);
A61J1/2013 (EP);
A61J1/2051 (EP);
A61M2005/3121 (EP);
A61M5/1782 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spritzenvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Medizin mit der Vorrichtung | [2012/43] | English: | Syringe device and method of preparing medicine using the device | [2012/43] | French: | Dispositif de seringue et procédé de préparation d'un médicament utilisant le dispositif | [2012/43] |
Former [2007/44] | SPRITZENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEDIZIN MIT DER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/44] | SYRINGE DEVICE AND METHOD OF PREPARING MEDICINE USING THE DEVICE | ||
Former [2007/44] | DISPOSITIF DE SERINGUE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN MEDICAMENT UTILISANT LE DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2007 | Translation filed | 30.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1036568 (KAKEN PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1* paragraph [0031] * |