EP1883187 - PACKET PROCESSING DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM EXECUTING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKA, Yoshihiro Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Yoshikatsu Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713370.2 | 09.02.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006JP302227 | Priority number, date | JP20050143739 | 17.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005143739 | [2008/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006123456 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1883187 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
H04L49/505 (EP,US);
H04L61/2557 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/5651 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKETVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, PAKETVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND DAS VERFAHREN AUSFÜHRENDES PROGRAMM | [2008/05] | English: | PACKET PROCESSING DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM EXECUTING THE METHOD | [2008/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUET, SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDE DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS ET PROGRAMME POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2007 | Translation filed | 15.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 19.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |