EP1873223 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR SEALING MATERIAL, SEALING MATERIAL, SEALING METHOD AND ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Yugo c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura, Sodeg aura-shi, Chiba, 2990265 / JP | 02 /
ITOU, Yuichi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura, Sodeg aura-shi, Chiba, 2990265 / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713515.2 | 10.02.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP302372 | Priority number, date | JP20050040008 | 17.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005040008 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087979 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873223 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10, C08K3/22, C08L63/00, C08L71/02, H05B33/04, H05B33/10 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
C09K3/10 (EP,KR);
H10K59/873 (EP,KR);
C09K2200/0239 (EP);
C09K2200/0647 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2008/21] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SIEGELMATERIAL, SIEGELMATERIAL, SIEGELVERFAHREN UND ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDE ANZEIGE | [2008/01] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR SEALING MATERIAL, SEALING MATERIAL, SEALING METHOD AND ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY | [2008/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE POUR SCELLANT, SCELLANT, PROCEDE DE SCELLEMENT ET AFFICHAGE ELECTROLUMINESCENT | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2007 | Translation filed | 13.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 26.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61143444 ; | [XI]US2003197300 (TANG HUI [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,10 * paragraph [0024]; example 4 * [I] 2; | [A]US2004166324 (MISHIMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* examples 3,6 *; | [XP]WO2005040277 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,5,7,10 * example 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 32, Database accession no. 1986-209571, XP002695562 & JPS61143444 A 19860701 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) [X] 1,5,7,10 * abstract * |