EP1865568 - FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAN, Hirofumi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
SATOH, Asako c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
YAJIMA, Akira c/o intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
TAKIZAWA, Yumiko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
SHIROKI, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/33] | 01 /
KAN, Hirofumi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
SATOH, Asako c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 11Shibaura1chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
YAJIMA, Akirac/o intellectual Property Division Toshiba corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKIZAWA, Yumiko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku / JP | |||
05 /
SHIROKI, Hiroyukic/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1_1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 8001 / JP | |||
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
KAN, Hirofumi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
SATOH, Asako c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 11Shibaura1chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
YAJIMA, Akirac/o intellectual Property Division Toshiba corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKIZAWA, Yumiko c/o Intellectual Property Divisio Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku / JP | |||
05 /
SHIROKI, Hiroyukic/o Intellectual Property Divisio Toshiba Corporation 1_1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06713519.4 | 10.02.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP302376 | Priority number, date | JP20050034610 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005034610 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006085619 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865568 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/92, H01M4/86, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
H01M4/86 (KR);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M4/92 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/04 (KR);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | H01M4/86, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/20] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2007/50] | English: | FUEL CELL | [2007/50] | French: | PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2007 | Translation filed | 02.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1304753 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claim - * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraphs [0001] , [0065] * * example 4 *; | [X]EP1320140 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claim - * * examples 1-7 *; | [A]US2004101741 (MINTEER SHELLEY D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim - * * paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0097] * |