10.05.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
20.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.08.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
31.07.2012 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
23.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
01.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
01.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
21.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.08.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
11.04.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
11.04.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
21.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
09.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
03.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|