EP1862558 - GENE DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Masahiro 2-41-5, Ikematsudai, Nishi-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuok a, 8190044 / JP | 02 /
ICHINOSE, Hirofumi 4-8-31-1202, Hakomatsu, Higashi-ku, Fukuoka-shi, F ukuoka, 8120061 / JP | 03 /
KITAOKA, Momoko 3-16-18-1202, Miyake, Minami-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fuku oka, 8111344 / JP | 04 /
OKAMURA, Nobuko 1-20-401, Gouguchimachi Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka, 812-0069 / JP | [2008/10] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
GOTO, Masahiro 2-41-5, Ikematsudai, Nishi-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuok a, 8190044 / JP | ||
02 /
ICHINOSE, Hirofumi 4-8-31-1202, Hakomatsu, Higashi-ku, Fukuoka-shi, F ukuoka, 8120061 / JP | |||
03 /
KITAOKA, Momoko 3-16-18-1202, Miyake, Minami-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fuku oka, 8111344 / JP | |||
04 /
OKAMURA, Nobuko 2-12-19-303, Hakozaki, Higashi-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fu kuoka, 8120053 / JP | Representative(s) | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06713965.9 | 17.02.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006JP302824 | Priority number, date | JP20050041479 | 18.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005041479 | [2007/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006088126 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862558 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6865 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2525/143, C12Q2521/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2525/143, C12Q2521/107 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6865, C12Q2525/143, C12Q2545/101, C12Q2521/119 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/22] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENNACHWEISVERFAHREN | [2007/49] | English: | GENE DETECTION METHOD | [2007/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN GÈNE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2007 | Translation filed | 14.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 21.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9621743 (AMBION INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * pages 69-71 *; | [YD]JP2002119291 (JAPAN BIOINDUSTRY ASS, et al) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004009612 (ZHAO XIAOJIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0013] , [0058] - [0060] - [0268] , [0275] - [0279] - [0326]; figures 25,39a,49,53 *; | [Y] - MYERS R M ET AL, "DETECTION OF SINGLE BASE SUBSTITUTIONS BY RIBONUCLEASE CLEAVAGE AT MISMATCHES IN RNA:DNA DUPLEXES", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, WASHINGTON, DC, (19851213), vol. 230, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1242 - 1246, XP001022204 [Y] 1-3 * page 1243, column LEFT; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.4071043 | [Y] - KURATA S ET AL, "Fluorescent quenching-based quantitative detection of specific DNA/RNA using a BODIPY((R)) FL-labeled probe or primer", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20010315), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0305-1048, page E34, XP002376104 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * *p. 3, section "quantitative detection of target DNA" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.6.e34 | [PX] - ICHINOSE HIROFUMI ET AL, "Detection of single-base mutations by fluorogenic ribonuclease protection assay.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY 1 NOV 2005, (20051101), vol. 77, no. 21, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 7047 - 7053, XP002528308 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AC050782K | [A] - GREEN M R ET AL, "HUMAN BETA-GLOBIN PRE-MRNA SYNTHESIZED IN VITRO IS ACCURATELY SPLICED IN XENOPUS OOCYTE NUCLEI", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (19830301), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 681 - 694, XP001085454 [A] 1-3 * page 691, column RIGHT * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(83)90054-5 | [A] - LIVACHE T ET AL, "DETECTION OF HIV1 DNA IN BIOLOGICAL SAMPLESS BY AN HOMOGENEOUS ASSAY: FLUORESCENCE MEASUREMENT OF DOUBLE-STRANDED RNA SYNTHESIZED FROM AMPLIFIED DNA", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (19940301), vol. 217, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 248 - 254, XP000425612 [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1994.1116 |