EP1854645 - SENSOR ABNORMALITY JUDGING DEVICE AND SENSOR ABNORMALITY JUDGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Hiromitsu c/o Bridgestone Corporation TC 1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | 02 /
HADA, Hiromasa c/o Bridgestone Corporation TC 1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | 03 /
KOKUBU, Takao c/o Bridgestone Corporation TC 1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06714173.9 | 21.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006JP303033 | Priority number, date | JP20050046124 | 22.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005046124 | JP20050046130 | 22.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005046130 | [2007/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006090690 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1854645 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854645 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, G01L17/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/0477 (EP,US);
B60C23/0481 (EP);
G01L27/007 (EP,US);
G01R31/2829 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/22] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON SENSORABNORMALITÄTEN | [2007/46] | English: | SENSOR ABNORMALITY JUDGING DEVICE AND SENSOR ABNORMALITY JUDGING METHOD | [2007/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JUGEMENT D' ANORMALITE DE CAPTEUR ET PROCEDE DE JUGEMENT D' ANORMALITE DE CAPTEUR | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2007 | Translation filed | 24.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1388439 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0051] * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO2004037566 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 4 ** figures 1,2 * |