EP1990723 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS CONTROL METHOD AND INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/28] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNNO, Hideyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
UKAI, Masaki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
AOKI, Naozumi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake 5th Floor Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London, WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06714790.0 | 27.02.2006 | [2008/46] | WO2006JP303653 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097040 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990723 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990723 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/22, G06F11/34, G01R31/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/0042 (EP,US);
H04L1/0047 (EP,US);
H04L25/4915 (EP,US);
G06F11/349 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/46] | G06F11/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/14] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/46] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS CONTROL METHOD AND INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2008/46] | French: | MÉTHODE DE COMMANDE D'APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ASSOCIÉ | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2008 | Translation filed | 08.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 30.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6243361 (MCMILLEN ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** column 11, lines 21-51 *; | [X]US2004001269 (ITOU DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11 * paragraphs [0035] , [0060] - [0062]; figures 2,3 * |