EP1860389 - REFRIGERATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg., 4-12, Nakazaka-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5308323 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMOTO, Masakazu, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries Ltd, 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
SAKITANI, Katsumi, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
MORIWAKI, Michio, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 04 /
INOKUCHI, Yume, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06715161.3 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006JP304078 | Priority number, date | JP20050073671 | 15.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005073671 | [2007/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006098165 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860389 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25B11/02, F25B1/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B9/06 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0272 (EP,US);
F25B2400/0751 (EP,US);
F25B2400/23 (EP,US);
F25B2500/18 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0253 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2007/48] | English: | REFRIGERATING APPARATUS | [2007/48] | French: | APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2007 | Translation filed | 18.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS58217163 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [Y] 6 [I] 2-5; | [A]DE10010864 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1411308 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2004138333 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 6 * the whole document * |