EP1854575 - ELECTRODE TIP SHAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/46] | ELECTRODE TIP SHAPING DEVICE AND ELECTRODE TIP SHAPING TOOL | ||
[2016/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2017/12] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGURA, Shuhei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Kouji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Mikiji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 04 /
DOI, Yuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Takayuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 06 /
TERADA, Shinji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 07 /
SHINKI, Kiyoshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 08 /
KIMURA, Hideya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 09 /
TANAKA, Yoshinori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06715247.0 | 28.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006JP304188 | Priority number, date | JP20050056174 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005056174 | [2007/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006093303 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1854575 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854575 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/30 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B23K11/3063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/12] |
Former [2008/15] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENSPITZEN-FORMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/41] | English: | ELECTRODE TIP SHAPING DEVICE | [2016/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'EXTREMITES D'ELECTRODES | [2016/41] |
Former [2007/46] | ELEKTRODENSPITZEN-FORMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRODEBSPITZEN-FORMUNGSWERKZEUG | ||
Former [2007/46] | ELECTRODE TIP SHAPING DEVICE AND ELECTRODE TIP SHAPING TOOL | ||
Former [2007/46] | DISPOSITIF ET OUTIL DE FORMATION D'EXTREMITES D'ELECTRODES | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2007 | Translation filed | 21.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 02.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.03.2017 | [2018/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4762446 (NISHIWAKI TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US6499921 (FRASHER ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-4* abstract *; | [X]JP2005014019 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |