EP1992085 - APPARATUS FOR USING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION IN COMMON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 65, Youngchon-ri, Tongtan-myon Hwasong-shi Kyonggi-do 445-813 / KR | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Duk-Yong 263-41, Gomae-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-901 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Sang-Sig 203-603, Sinil Apt. Yeongdeok-ri, Giheung-eup Yongijn-si Gyeonggi-do 449-741 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Myoung-Hoon 105-406, Hanguk 2-cha Apt., Maetan 4-dong, Yeongt ong-gu, Suwon-si; Gyeonggi-do 443-720 / KR | [2013/33] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
KIM, Duk-Yong 263-41, Gomae-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-901 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Sang-Sig 203-603, Sinil Apt., Yeongdeok-ri, Giheung-eup Yongijn-si Gyeonggi-do 449-741 / KR | |||
03 /
YANG, Myoung-Hoon 105-406, Hanguk 2-cha Apt., Maetan 4-dong, Yeongt ong-gu, Suwon-si; Gyeonggi-do 443-720 / KR | Representative(s) | Van Gorkom, Lucas Marijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Van Gorkom, Lucas Marijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2008/47] | Van Gorkom, Lucas Marijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 06716419.4 | 16.03.2006 | [2008/47] | WO2006KR00969 | Priority number, date | KR20060019691 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: KR 20060019691 | [2008/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007100169 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | KO | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992085 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992085 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/52, H01P1/213 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
H04B1/406 (EP,US);
H04B7/15542 (BR);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H01P1/213 (EP,BR,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,BR,US);
H01Q21/0025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | H04B7/155 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEMEINSAMEN VERWENDUNG EINER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONS-BASISSTATION | [2008/47] | English: | APPARATUS FOR USING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION IN COMMON | [2008/47] | French: | APPAREIL UTILISANT UNE STATION DE BASE COMMUNE DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2007 | Translation filed | 23.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 23.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 21.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2006 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | IE | 16.03.2014 | LU | 16.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.03.2006 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2014 | ||
LU | 16.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
PT | 16.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1175427 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE [FR]) [A] 1-15* page 2, line 47 - line 49 *; | [Y]JPS56144643 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 3-12,15 * abstract *; | [Y]US6411176 (ATOKAWA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 6, line 20 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6483399 (ATOKAWA MASAYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - line 31 * * column 2, line 22 - line 63 *; | [Y]US2003045244 (LINDEMANN BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5412354 (QUAN CLIFTON [US]); | [Y]US6411176 (ATOKAWA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2003054861 (SKARBY ULF [SE]); | [Y]US6748197 (LINDEMANN BRIAN [US], et al) |