EP1861531 - STEAM GENERATOR, AND LAUNDRY DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Seog Kyu, 107-1203 Daedong Apt. Daebang-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-757 / KR | 02 /
AHN, In Geun, 104-601 HanlimPurgio Apt. Seongju-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-941 / KR | [2015/03] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
PARK, Seog Kyu, 107-1203 Daedong Apt. Daebang-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-757 / KR | ||
02 /
AHN, In Geun, 104-601 HanlimPurgio Apt. Seongju-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-941 / KR | |||
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
PARK, Seog Kyu, 07-1203 Daedong Apt. Daebang-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-757 / KR | ||
02 /
AHN, In Geun, 104-601 HanlimPurgio Apt. Seongju-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-941 / KR | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Urner, Peter Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06716474.9 | 21.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006KR01025 | Priority number, date | KR20050025039 | 25.03.2005 Original published format: KR 20050025039 | KR20050025040 | 25.03.2005 Original published format: KR 20050025040 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101336 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861531 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861531 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1861531 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06F35/00, D06F39/04, D06F39/08, F22B1/28 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
F22B1/28 (EP,US);
D06F39/04 (EP,US);
D06F39/40 (EP,US);
D06F58/20 (EP,US);
D06F2105/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | DAMPFERZEUGER SOWIE WASCHVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/49] | English: | STEAM GENERATOR, AND LAUNDRY DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF | [2007/49] | French: | GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 03.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2010
06.03.2013
WITHDRAWN Daewoo Electronics Corporation Narakeyum Jeodong Building 1ga Jeodong Junggu Seoul 100-031 / KR Opponent's representative Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2010
06.03.2013
WITHDRAWN Daewoo Electronics Corporation Narakeyum Jeodong Building 1ga Jeodong Junggu Seoul 100-031 / KR Opponent's representative Stolmár & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2010
23.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE Daewoo Electronics Corporation Narakeyum Jeodong Building 1ga Jeodong Junggu Seoul 100-031 / KR Opponent's representative Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | 21.01.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.05.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.06.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.12.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | IE | 21.03.2010 | LU | 21.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | [2015/39] |
Former [2015/22] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 21.03.2010 | ||
LU | 21.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 21.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 21.03.2010 | ||
IT | 21.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 21.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0302125 (RONCHI ELENA); | [X]EP1469120 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]EP1507028 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | EP1469120 | Opposition | DE2514771 | DE3103529 | US4572943 | US5063609 | EP1655408 |