EP1857815 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING HIDDEN SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samoylov, Valentin Nikolaevich ul. Pontekorvo, 20-44 Dubna, Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU | [2014/29] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Samojlov, Valentin Nikolaevich Ul. Pontekorvo, 20-44 Dubna, Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samoylov, Valentin Nikolaevich ul. Pontekorvo, 20-44 Dubna Moskovskaya obl, 141980 / RU | 02 /
Denisov, Dimitrij Valerievich ul. Dolgoozernaya, 11-16 St. Petersburg, 197373 / RU | 03 /
Kulikovskij, Sergej Yurievich pr-t Aviakonstruktorov, 45-1-22 St. Petersburg, 197373 / RU | 04 /
Samoshkin, Aleksandr Mihajlovich ul. Sosnovaya 5 Dubna Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU | 05 /
Sokorin, Oleg Naumovich pr-t Slavy, 19-1-47 St. Petersburg, 190121 / RU | [2014/29] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
DENISOV, Dmitrij Valerievich ul. Dolgoozernaya, 11-16 St.Petersburg, 197373 / RU | ||
02 /
KULIKOVSKIJ, Sergej Yurievich pr-t Aviakonstruktorov, 45-1-22 St.Petersburg, 197373 / RU | |||
03 /
SAMOSHKIN, Aleksandr Mihajlovich ul. Sosnovaya 5 Dubna Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU | |||
04 /
SOKORIN, Oleg Naumovich pr-t Slavy, 19-1-47 St.Petersburg, 190121 / RU | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Jeck, Anton Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 06716855.9 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006RU00034 | Priority number, date | RU20050105427 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: RU 2005105427 | [2007/47] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006093431 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | RU | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857815 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857815 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1857815 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/83, // G01V3/10 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
G01R33/44 (EP);
G01R33/07 (EP);
G01R33/441 (EP);
G01N24/084 (EP);
G01R33/445 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | G01N27/83 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION VERSTECKTER SUBSTANZEN | [2007/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING HIDDEN SUBSTANCES | [2007/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE SUBSTANCES CACHEES | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2007 | Translation filed | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2006 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | DK | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]RU2064177 ; | [A]US5189366 ; | [A]EP0337783 | by applicant | - Y. AHARONOV; D. BOHM, PHYS.REV., (1959), vol. 115, no. 3, page 485 | - R. CHAMBERS, PHYS. REV. LETT., (1960), vol. 5, page 3 | - A. TONOMURA, PHYS. REV. LETT., (1986), vol. 56, page 792 |