EP1856520 - MICROWAVE ACCELERATED PLASMONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE COUNTY 1000 Hilltop Circle Baltimore, MD 21250 / US | [2011/28] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BIOTECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE 701 East Pratt Street, Suite 200 Baltimore, MD 21202-3101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEDDES, Chris D. 817 Deep Wood Court Bel-Air, MD 21015 / US | [2015/25] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
GEDDES, Chris, D. 817 Deep Wood Court Bel-Air, Maryland 21015 / US | Representative(s) | Chalk, Anthony John, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [2015/25] |
Former [2011/16] | Chalk, Anthony John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/51] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 4d Postfach 19 04 80 50501 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Brandenburg, Thomas Patentanwalt Lindenstrasse 1 53773 Hennef / DE | Application number, filing date | 06717254.4 | 03.01.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US00029 | Priority number, date | US20050641245P | 03.01.2005 Original published format: US 641245 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006074130 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1856520 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1856520 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/48 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/54393 (EP);
G01N33/54346 (EP);
G01N33/54373 (EP);
G01N2333/11 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | G01N33/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENBESCHLEUNIGTE PLASMONICS | [2007/47] | English: | MICROWAVE ACCELERATED PLASMONICS | [2007/47] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES PLASMONIQUES D'ACCELERATION A MICRO-ONDES | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 14.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 14.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2006 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | IE | 03.01.2016 | LU | 03.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.01.2006 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0214868 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN], et al) [Y] 1-16 * examples, claims *; | [E]WO2006137945 (UNIV MARYLAND BIOTECH INST [US], et al) [E] 1-16 * par. 0051, 0052, 0093, claims 23 - 29 *; | [Y] - HIRSCH L R ET AL, "A WHOLE BLOOD IMMUNOASSAY USING GOLD NANOSHELLS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030515), vol. 75, no. 10, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2377 - 2381, XP001170909 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0262210 | [Y] - BUDDE U ET AL, "DRASTISCHE VERKUERZUNG VON INKUBATIONSZEITEN BEI IMMUNHAEMATOLOGISCHEN UNTERSUCHUNGEN DURCH EINSATZ VON MIKROWELLENGERAETEN", INFUSIONSTHERAPIE UND TRANSFUSIONSMEDIZIN, BASEL, CH, (19950101), vol. 22, no. SUPPL. 01, ISSN 1019-8466, pages 92 - 94, XP000985251 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * | [Y] - ELGHANIAN ROBERT ET AL, "Selective colorimetric detection of polynucleotides based on the distance-dependent optical properties of gold nanoparticles", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (1997), vol. 277, no. 5329, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1078 - 1081, XP002566839 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5329.1078 | [T] - ASLAN ET AL, "Microwave-Accelerated Surface Plasmon-Coupled Directional Luminescence: Application to fast and sensitive assays in buffer, human serum and whole blood", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070511), vol. 323, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 55 - 64, XP022071916 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2007.02.010 | International search | [X] - KOGAN M.J. ET AL., "Nanoparticle-Mediated Local and Remote Manipulation of Protein Aggregation", NANO LETTERS, (2006), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 110 - 115, XP003012734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl0516862 | [X] - ZHAO Y. ET AL., "Microwave-Induced Polyol-Process Synthesis of Copper and Copper Oxide Nanocrystals with Controllable Morphology", EUR. INORG. CHEM., (2004), vol. 20, pages 4072 - 4080, XP003012735 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejic.200400258 | [Y] - MA ET AL., ANAL. BIOANAL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 382, pages 1044 - 1048, XP019327424 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-005-3222-4 | [Y] - ZHANG J. ET AL., "Complexation of polysaccharide and monosaccharide with thiolate boronic acid capped on silver nanoparticle", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 332, pages 253 - 260, XP003012736 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2004.05.051 | by applicant | WO0214868 | WO2006137945 | - WAYNANT, R. W. ET AL., LEOS NEWSLETTER, (1998), vol. 12, pages 3 - 6 | - HIRSCH R.W. ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (20030515), vol. 75, no. 10, pages 2377 - 2381 | - BUDDE U. ET AL., INFUSIONSTHERAPIE UND TRANSFUSIONSMEDIZIN, (19950101), vol. 22, no. 01, pages 92 - 94 | - ELGHANIAN R., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 5329, pages 1078 - 1081 |