EP1833494 - REGENERATION OF PANCREATIC ISLETS BY AMNIOTIC FLUID STEM CELL THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wake Forest University Health Sciences One Technology Place 200 East First Street Suite 101 Winston-Salem North Carolina 27101 / US | [2016/20] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Wake Forest University Health Sciences One Technology Place, 200 East First Street, Suite 101 Winston-Salem North Carolina 27101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATALA, Anthony 2661 Reynolds Drive Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27157 / US | 02 /
MILANESI, Anna 1430 North Harper Avenue 306 West Hollywood, CA 90046 / US | 03 /
SOKER, Shay 9 Roundtree Court Greensboro, North Carolina 27410 / US | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
ATALA, Anthony 2661 Reynolds Drive Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27157 / US | ||
02 /
MILANESI, Anna 370-s Glendare Court Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27104 / US | |||
03 /
SOKER, Shay 9 Roundtree Court Greensboro, North Carolina 27410 / US | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2008/33] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square GB-Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06717519.0 | 06.01.2006 | [2007/38] | WO2006US00334 | Priority number, date | US20050642381P | 07.01.2005 Original published format: US 642381 P | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006074308 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1833494 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1833494 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A61K35/50, A61P5/48 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
A61K35/39 (EP,US);
A61K35/50 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
C12N5/0605 (EP,US);
C12N5/0607 (EP,US);
C12N5/0676 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C12N2501/60 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | A01N63/00, A01N65/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/38] | A61K35/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER LANGERHANSSCHEN ZELLEN DURCH FRUCHTWASSERSTAMMZELLENTHERAPIE | [2007/38] | English: | REGENERATION OF PANCREATIC ISLETS BY AMNIOTIC FLUID STEM CELL THERAPY | [2007/38] | French: | REGENERATION DES ILOTS PANCREATIQUES PAR TRAITEMENT DES CELLULES SOUCHES DU LIQUIDE AMNIOTIQUE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 01.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2006 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | IT | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | IS | 18.09.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | IE | 06.01.2017 | LU | 06.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.01.2006 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.01.2006 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 06.01.2006 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.01.2006 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03047607 ; | [Y]WO0236751 (KOURION THERAPEUTICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * * see esp. p. 7, end pf 3rd paragraph. *; | [Y]US2002164307 (HABENER JOEL F [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraphs [0205] , [0000] , [0208] *; | [Y]WO03026584 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 3; claims 1,3,11,13 *; | [YP]US2005118712 (TSAI MING-SONG [TW], et al) [YP] 1-35 * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0018] - [0020] - [0060] , [0087] *; | [Y] - TAMAGAWA T ET AL, "ESTABLISHMENT AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL LINE DERIVED FROM HUMAN AMNIOTIC MEMBRANES AND INITIATION OF GERM LAYERS IN VITRO", HUMAN CELL, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, UK; JP, (20040101), vol. y, no. 3, ISSN 0914-7470, pages 125 - 130, XP009075883 [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 46, Database accession no. 2003-493589, XP002574798 & WO03047607 A1 20030612 (NIKAIDO T) [X] 1,4-9,17,20-27,29,32 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 2,3,10-16,18,19,28,30,31,33-35 | [T] - DE COPPI PAOLO ET AL, "Isolation of amniotic stem cell lines with potential for therapy.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY JAN 2007, (200701), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 100 - 106, XP002574799 [T] * page 100, column l, paragraph 1 * * abstract * * page 100, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 101, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 103, column r, paragraphs 2,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1274 | [Y] - RAMIYA VIJAYAKUMAR K ET AL, "Reversal of insulin-dependent diabetes using islets generated in vitro from pancreatic stem cells", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000301), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 278 - 282, XP000864764 [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/73128 | International search | [X]WO03042405 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al); | [Y]US2006216277 (EFRAT SHIMON [IL]) | Examination | WO03042405 | - MCKINNON C M ET AL, "PANCREATIC DUODENAL HOMEOBOX-1, PDX-1, A MAJOR REGULATOR OF BETA CELL IDENTITY AND FUNCTION", DIABETOLOGIA, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20011001), vol. 44, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S001250100628, ISSN 0012-186X, pages 1203 - 1214, XP001176889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001250100628 | - TANG D-Q ET AL, "In vivo and in vitro characterization of insulin-producing cells obtained from murine bone marrow", DIABETES, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, US, (20040701), vol. 53, doi:10.2337/DIABETES.53.7.1721, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 1721 - 1732, XP003004042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.53.7.1721 | - VALERIE A MCLIN ET AL, "Organogenesis: Making Pancreas from Liver", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (20030201), vol. 13, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00036-8, ISSN 0960-9822, pages R96 - R98, XP055070086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00036-8 | by applicant | WO03042405 | US5702444 | - RITZ, E.; SCHOMIG M., "The diabetic patient with renal failure", NEFROLOGIA, (2000), vol. 20, pages 16 - 24 | - BROWNLEE M., "Biochemistry and molecular cell biology of diabetic complications", NATURE, (2001), vol. 414, pages 813 - 820 | - RAJAGOPAL, J. ET AL., "Insulin staining of ES cell progeny from insulin uptake", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, page 363 | - SORIA, B. ET AL., "Insulin-secreting cells derived from embryonic stem cells normalize glycemia in streptozotocin-induced diabetic mice", DIABETES, (2000), vol. 49, no. 2, doi:doi:10.2337/diabetes.49.2.157, pages 157 - 62, XP002183378 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.49.2.157 | - DECOPPI PAOLO ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2007), vol. 25, pages LOO - 106 | - T ANKER, P.S. ET AL., "Amniotic fluid as a novel source of mesenchymal stem cells for therapeutic transplantation", BLOOD, (2003), vol. 102, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2003-04-1291, pages 1548 - 9, XP009085337 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-04-1291 | - PRUSA, A.R. ET AL., "Oct-4-expressing cells in human amniotic fluid: a new source for stem cell research?", HUM REPROD, (2003), vol. 18, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1093/humrep/deg279, pages 1489 - 93, XP002277347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/deg279 | - KAVIANI, A. ET AL., "The amniotic fluid as a source of cells for fetal tissue engineering", J PEDIATR SURG, (2001), vol. 36, no. 11, pages 1662 - 5 | - PRUSA, A.R.; M. HENGSTSCHLAGER, "Amniotic fluid cells and human stem cell research: a new connection", MED SCI MONIT, (2002), vol. 8, no. 11, pages RA253 - 7, XP002419092 | - LAB INV, (2004), vol. 84, pages 607 - 617 | - OTONKOSKI, T. ET AL., "Nicotinamide is a potent inducer of endocrine differentiation in cultured human fetal pancreatic cells", J CLIN INVEST, (1993), vol. 92, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI116723, pages 1459 - 1466, XP009008891 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI116723 | - HORI, Y. ET AL., "Growth inhibitor promote differentiation of insulin-producing tissue from embryonic stem cells", PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.252618999, pages 16105 - 16110, XP002392968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.252618999 | - NIELSEN, LL. ET AL., "Pharmacology of exenatide (synthetic exendin-4): a potential therapeutic for improved glycemic control of type 2 diabetes", REGUL PEPT., (20040215), vol. 117, no. 2, pages 77 - 88 | - LEON-QUINTO, T. ET AL., "In vitro direct differentiation of mouse embryonic stem cells into insulin-producing cells", DIABETOLOGIA, (2004), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1007/s00125-004-1458-8, pages 1442 - 1451, XP002699175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-004-1458-8 |