EP1841333 - SOY PROTEIN FOR INFANT FORMULA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solae, LLC 4300 Duncan Avenue St. Louis, MO 63110 / US | [2009/21] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states SOLAE, LLC P.O. Box 88940 St. Louis, MO 63188 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Theodore, M 476 Madrina Court Ballwin, Missouri 63021 / US | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06718081.0 | 12.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006US00966 | Priority number, date | US20050644266P | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 644266 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006076425 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841333 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A23L1/20, A23J3/16, A23J3/34 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
A23L33/185 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOJAPROTEIN FÜR KINDERNAHRUNG | [2007/41] | English: | SOY PROTEIN FOR INFANT FORMULA | [2007/41] | French: | PROTEINE DE SOJA POUR FORMULE NUTRITIONNELLE DESTINEE A DES ENFANTS EN BAS AGE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.2007 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | HU   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | IS   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | LT   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | LV   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | PL   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | RO   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | 24.09.2007 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   04.12.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0380343 (ALKO LTD [FI]) [X] 1-22 * page 6, lines 20-26; examples 2-4; claims 1-3,6-9; table 4 * * page 7, line 1 * * page 2, lines 15-20 *; | [X]EP1181869 (PROTEIN TECH INT [US]) [X] 1-22 * examples 1-7; claims 1-3,19,31 * * page 2, paragraphs 2,3 *; | [X]US2002123090 (WONG THEODORE M [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 1, paragraphs 2,3; examples 1-7; claims 1,32,37 *; | [X]EP1364585 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph 25 - page 5, paragraph 28; examples 1,3-8; claims 1,4,8 *; | [X]US3966971 (MOREHOUSE ALPHA L, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 11; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US3736147 (IACOBUCCI G, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, lines 13-35; example 7; claims 1,9 *; | [X]US3733207 (MCCABE E) [X] 1-11 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1174516 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * examples 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X]US4697004 (PUSKI GABOR [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 10; examples 1-3; claims 1,20 *; | [PX]US2005202147 (WONG THEODORE M [US], et al) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * |