EP1850814 - System for bringing hypothermia rapidly onboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/45] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BRINGING HYPOTHERMIA RAPIDLY ONBOARD | ||
[2018/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoll Circulation, Inc. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Zoll Circulation, Inc. 650 Almanor Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Alsius Corporation Suite 150, 15770 Laguna Canyon Road Irvine California 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINS, Kenneth, A. 22532 Facina Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 02 /
WORTHEN, William, J. 37 Oakbrook Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06718258.4 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US01164 | Priority number, date | US20050064187 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: US 64187 | US20050108281 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: US 108281 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006091284 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850814 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02, A61F7/12 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61F7/02 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0056 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2007/126 (EP,US);
A61F7/0085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | A61F7/00, A61F7/12 | ||
Former IPC [2007/45] | A61F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur schnellen an-bord-schaffung von hypothermie | [2018/48] | English: | System for bringing hypothermia rapidly onboard | [2018/48] | French: | Systeme destines a instaurer rapidement l'hypothermie a l'interieur d'un corps | [2018/48] |
Former [2007/45] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNELLEN AN-BORD-SCHAFFUNG VON HYPOTHERMIE | ||
Former [2007/45] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BRINGING HYPOTHERMIA RAPIDLY ONBOARD | ||
Former [2007/45] | SYSTEME ET METHODE DESTINES A INSTAURER RAPIDEMENT L'HYPOTHERMIE A L'INTERIEUR D'UN CORPS | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 10.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/09] | Divisional application(s) | EP19163548.1 / EP3524212 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5716386 (WARD KEVIN R [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 5, line 32 - line 41; figure 1 * * column 11, line 4 - line 7 * * column 13, line 23 - line 61; figure 12 *; | [X]WO0010494 (RADIANT MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * line 20 - page 22, line 8 * * page 35, line 3 - page 38, line 10; figures 9-10 * * abstract * * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 2 *; | [A]EP1029520 (ALSIUS CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0022] *; | [A]WO0176517 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 15 - line 30; figures 1,4,12-14 * * page 10, line 5 - line 15 *; | [A]US6551309 (LEPIVERT PATRICK J M [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0056] * | International search | [Y]US6673098 (MACHOLD TIMOTHY R [US], et al); | [A]US2002161349 (ALLERS MATS [SE], et al); | [A]US5383854 (SAFAR PETER [US], et al) | Examination | US5476444 | WO0053135 | US2003130651 | WO2004001373 | US2004024437 | by applicant | US6409747 | US6405080 | US6393320 | US6368304 | US6338727 | US6299599 | US6290717 | US6287326 | US6165207 | US6149670 | US6146411 | US6126684 | US6306161 | US6264679 | US6231594 | US6149676 | US6149673 | US6110168 | US5989238 | US5879329 | US5837003 | US6383210 | US6379378 | US6364899 | US6325818 | US6312452 | US6261312 | US6254626 | US6251130 | US6251129 | US6245095 | US6238428 | US6235048 | US6231595 | US6224624 | US6149677 | US6096068 | US6042559 | US6827728 | US6818012 | US6802855 | US6799063 | US6764391 | US6692518 | US6669715 | US6660027 | US6648905 | US6645232 | US6620187 | US6461379 | US6375674 | US6197045 | US6188930 | WO0010494 | US5716386 |