EP1864429 - COMBINATION OF HIGH-SIDE AND LOW-SIDE CURRENT SENSING IN SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING POWER OVER COMMUNICATION LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035-7417 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states LINEAR TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035-7417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWELLEY, David, McLean Whistlerweg 28 D-81479 Munchen / DE | 02 /
HEATH, Jeffrey, Lynn 2919 Kenmore Place Santa Barbara, CA 93105 / US | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
DWELLEY, David, Mclean 2932 Cliff Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | ||
02 /
HEATH, Jeffrey, Lynn 2919 Kenmore Place Santa Barbara, CA 93105 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate GB-London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06718369.9 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US01283 | Priority number, date | US20050646509P | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 646509 P | US20050267261 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 267261 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081082 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1864429 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864429 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/10, H04L5/20, H04L12/56, H04L25/02, G01R31/02 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
H04L25/028 (EP,US);
H04B3/44 (KR);
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04L25/0282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON HIGH-SIDE- UND LOW-SIDE-STROMMESSUNG IN EINEM SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER POWER-OVER-COMMUNICATION-VERBINDUNG | [2007/50] | English: | COMBINATION OF HIGH-SIDE AND LOW-SIDE CURRENT SENSING IN SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING POWER OVER COMMUNICATION LINK | [2007/50] | French: | DETECTION DE COURANT COMBINE EN AMONT ET EN AVAL DANS UN SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN LIEN DE COMMUNICATION | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.08.2010 | Appeal received | 22.10.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.12.2010 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.10.2007 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | HU   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | IS   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | LT   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | LV   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | PL   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | RO   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | 01.10.2007 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.2007 | M02   Fee paid on   03.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2006 | AT | 20.04.2011 | BE | 20.04.2011 | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | LV | 20.04.2011 | PL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SE | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | IE | 13.01.2012 | LU | 13.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 13.01.2012 | ||
LU | 13.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 13.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 13.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 13.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
PT | 22.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004068781 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 7 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 28 * [Y] 14,19; | [XY]US2004227522 (MALE BARRY JON [US]) [X] 1-11,13,17,18,20 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] , [0024] - [0027] * [Y] 12,14,19; | [Y] - "PART 3: CARRIER SENSE MULTIPLE ACCESS WITH COLLISION DETECTION (CSMA/CD) ACCESS METHOD AND PHYSICAL LAYER SPECIFICATIONS. AMENDMENT: DATA TERMINAL EQUIPMENT (DTE) POWER VIA MEDIA DEPENDENT INTERFACE (MDI)", IEEE STD 802.3AF-2003,, (20030618), pages 1 - 131, XP002383689 [Y] 12 * paragraph [33.2.1] * * paragraph [33.2.7] * * paragraph [33.2.8.12] * * paragraphs [33.4.3] - [33.4.4] * | [A] - MENDELSON G, "All You Need To Know About Power over Ethernet (PoE) and the IEEE 802.3af Standard", POWERDSINE PROPRIETARY INFORMATION, Hod Hasharon, Israel;Farmingdale, USA;Uxbridge, UK, (200406), XP002372480 [A] 1,10,15,17,20 * paragraph [0003] * |