EP1836252 - AMINE POLYMER-MODIFIED NANOPARTICULATE CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street, MC=01135 Rochester, New York 14608 / US | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINGLEY, Joseph, Francis 87 Bronze Leaf Trail Rochester, NY 14612 / US | 02 /
QIAO, Tiecheng, Alex 1240 Sagebrook Way Webster, NY 14580 / US | 03 /
HARDER, John, William 6 Tarrycrest Lane Rochester, NY 14606 / US | 04 /
WUNDER, Andrew 3200 Route 14 Lyons, NY 14489 / US | 05 /
HEWITT, James, M. 167 Blum Road Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/39] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06718411.9 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006US01332 | Priority number, date | US20050036814 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 36814 | US20050165849 | 24.06.2005 Original published format: US 165849 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006076636 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836252 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/00, C08K9/08, C08K9/10, C08K9/12, B01J13/00, B01J13/02, B01J13/04, G01N33/58, A61K9/00, C08J7/00, C03C17/00 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0043 (EP,US);
A61K49/0076 (EP,US);
A61K49/0093 (EP,US);
A61K9/5146 (EP,US);
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
C03C12/00 (EP,US);
C03C17/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/08] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINPOLYMERMODIFIZIERTE NANOPARTIKELTRÄGER | [2007/39] | English: | AMINE POLYMER-MODIFIED NANOPARTICULATE CARRIERS | [2007/39] | French: | PORTEURS DE NANOPARTICULES D'AMINE MODIFIES PAR POLYMERE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 15.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | 08.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1013605 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0045]; example -; claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO02087750 (GUGGENBICHLER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 9 - page 15, line 18; examples 1-17; claims 1-37 *; | [X]US2003124194 (GAW DEBRA A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0078]; examples 1-4; claims 1-21 *; | [XP]US2005192381 (BRINGLEY JOSEPH F [US], et al) [XP] 1-20* the whole document * |