EP1836815 - DYNAMIC AND INTELLIGENT BUFFER MANAGEMENT FOR SAN EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose CA 95134-1706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDARAM, Ganesh 7475 Monet Place Rohnert Park, California 94928 / US | 02 /
DIAB, John 2876 Liscum Street Santa Rosa, California 95407 / US | 03 /
AMIN, Hitesh 380 Raven Way Petaluma, California 94954 / US | 04 /
RYLE, Thomas, Eric 9629 Miranda Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27617 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/30] |
Former [2007/39] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06718440.8 | 12.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006US01363 | Priority number, date | US20050036596 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 36596 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006076652 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1836815 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836815 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
H04J3/0682 (EP,US);
H04J3/1617 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/283 (EP,US);
H04L47/35 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | H04L12/56, H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE UND INTELLIGENTE PUFFERVERWALTUNG FÜR DIE SAN-ERWEITERUNG | [2007/39] | English: | DYNAMIC AND INTELLIGENT BUFFER MANAGEMENT FOR SAN EXTENSION | [2007/39] | French: | GESTION DE TAMPONS DYNAMIQUE ET INTELLIGENTE POUR EXTENSION DE RESEAU SAN | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 10.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2006 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | IE | 12.01.2019 | LU | 12.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003074449 (SMITH RORY [GB], et al) [Y] 1-25 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0129] ** paragraph [0142] *; | [Y]US2004085902 (MILLER PIERRE [CA], et al) [Y] 1-25 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0050] * * figures 5,8 *; | [Y]US2004153566 (LALSANGI NAGARAJ [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0040] * * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2005002338 (DEVDAS VIKRAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] * * figures 1,2A,2B * | International search | [Y]US6259677 (JAIN JASWANT R [US]); | [A]US6278718 (ESCHHOLZ SIEGMAR K [US]); | [Y]US2002083190 (KAMIYA SATOSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2003074449 | US2004085902 | US2004153566 | US2005002338 | US20060342603 | US20030390813 |