EP1838373 - HEAT AND MOISTURE EXCHANGE DEVICE FOR RESPIRATORY THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleflex Medical Incorporated 2917 Weck Drive Durham, NC 27709 / US | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURK, Mark Alan 34490 Briggs Road Murrieta, California 92563 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2007/40] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06718682.5 | 18.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006US01645 | Priority number, date | US20050038347 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 38347 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006078667 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838373 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838373 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/10 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
A61M16/1045 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (EP,US);
A61M16/0465 (EP,US);
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,US);
A61M16/20 (EP,US);
A61M2205/7563 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | WÄRME- UND FLÜSSIGKEITSTAUSCHER FÜR DIE ATEMWEGSTHERAPIE | [2007/40] | English: | HEAT AND MOISTURE EXCHANGE DEVICE FOR RESPIRATORY THERAPY | [2007/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECHANGE DE CHALEUR ET D'HUMIDITE POUR UNE THERAPIE RESPIRATOIRE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 01.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2006 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | NL | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | IE | 18.01.2014 | LU | 18.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.01.2006 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
PT | 25.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004123974 (MARLER GREGORY S [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [X]US6550476 (RYDER STEVEN L [US]) [X] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2005047797 (HUDSON RESPIRATORY CARE INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [A]US5505768 (ALTADONNA ANTHONY J [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004118402 (HEINONEN ERKKI [FI]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US6792946 (WALDO JR JAMES V [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004123974 | US6550476 |