EP1841566 - STAPLER WITH STACK HEIGHT COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACCO Brands USA LLC 300 Tower Parkway Lincolnshire, IL 60069-3665 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, David, P. 1000 South Summit Street Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US | 02 /
BARGO, Kenneth, J. 7338 Farwell Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06719162.7 | 20.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006US02203 | Priority number, date | US20050647658P | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 647658 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081159 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841566 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25C5/02 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
B25C5/0228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/18] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEFTGERÄT MIT STAPELHÖHENAUSGLEICH | [2007/41] | English: | STAPLER WITH STACK HEIGHT COMPENSATION | [2007/41] | French: | AGRAFEUSE MUNIE D'UN SYSTEME DE COMPENSATION DE LA HAUTEUR DE LA PILE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 31.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5222645 (SUEDA NORIO [JP]); | [Y]US6547119 (HUANG CHIEN KAI [TW]); | [A]US2770805 (PHILIP ELZER, et al); | [A]US2975424 (OUSSANI JAMES J); | [A]US2500217 (TAYLOR JR FRANCIS J); | [A]US6820787 (PINCZEWSKI MORRIS [US], et al) |