EP1842015 - PULSE ELECTROTHERMAL AND HEAT-STORAGE ICE DETACHMENT APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Dartmouth College 11 Rope Ferry Road Hanover, New Hampshire 03755 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRENKO, Victor 4 Woodland Drive Lebanon, New Hampshire 03766 / US | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06719229.4 | 24.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006US02283 | Priority number, date | US20050646394P | 24.01.2005 Original published format: US 646394 P | US20050646932P | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 646932 P | US20050739506P | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 739506 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081180 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1842015 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/08, F28D17/00, F25C5/08 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
F25C5/08 (EP,KR);
F25D21/08 (EP,KR);
F28F1/325 (KR);
F25D2321/1413 (KR);
F25D2400/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF IMPULSBASIS ARBEITENDE, ELEKTROTHERMISCHE UND WÄRMESPEICHERNDE EISABTRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/41] | English: | PULSE ELECTROTHERMAL AND HEAT-STORAGE ICE DETACHMENT APPARATUS AND METHODS | [2007/41] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE DETACHEMENT DE GLACE D'UN STOCKAGE THERMIQUE ET PAR IMPULSION ELECTROTHERMIQUE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 26.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2510660 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT) [X] 1-3,6-12,15,16,46 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE3921900 (RHEINISCH-WESTFAELISCHES ELEKTRIZITAETSWERK AG, 4300 ESSEN, DE) [X] 11,12,46-48 * the whole document * [A] 49; | [X]GB820908 (ANDREW GEORGE HERON) [X] 1,4-9,11-13,46 * the whole document *; | [X]BE528926 (A.G: HERON) [X] 1,4-9,11-13,46 * the whole document *; | [X]BE410547 (G.A. LAURENT) [X] 1,6-9,11-13,46 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2510755 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT) [X] 1-3,6-12,15,16,46 * the whole document *; | [X]US4081914 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT, et al) [X] 1,11,12,46 * the whole document *; | [X]US2522199 (SHREVE CLIFFORD B) [X] 1,11,12,46 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1476989 (BUOB BEATE) [X] 1,11,12,46 * the whole document *; | [X]GB917055 (SIEMENS ELECTROGENERATE AG) [X] 1,11,12,46 * the whole document *; | [X]US4442681 (FISCHER HARRY C [US]) [X] 11 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2006002224 (DARTMOUTH COLLEGE [US], et al) [PX] 1,11,12,45-49 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0033614 (DARTMOUTH COLLEGE [US], et al); | [A]DE3626613 (LINDE AG [DE]) | [X] - PETRENKO V F ET AL, "PULSE ELECTROTHERMAL DE-ICING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL OFFSHORE AND POLAR ENGINEERING CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20030525), pages 435 - 438, XP008054503 [X] 11,46 * the whole document * |