EP1843798 - HYDROPHYLIC BIOCOMPATIBLE ADHESIVE FORMULATIONS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corium International, Inc. 235 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | For all designated states A. V. Topchiev Institute of Petrochemical Synthesis Russian Academy of Sciences, 29, Leninsky Prosp. Moscow, 117912 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Corium International Inc. 235 Constitution Drive Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | ||
For all designated states A. V. Topchiev Institute of Petrochemical Synthesis Russian Academy of Sciences, 29, Leninsky Prosp. Moscow, 117912 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Parminder 32404 Pacific Grove Court Union City, California 94587 / US | 02 /
LEE, Eun Soo 1550 Oak Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 03 /
SAGI, Appala 146 Madison Avenue, No. 6 Redwood City, California 94061 / US | 04 /
FELDSTEIN, Mikhail M. Leninsky Prospekt 102, Apt. 145 Moscow, 119415 / RU | 05 /
BAIRAMOV, Danir F. 257 Arriba Drive, No. 1 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
SINGH, Parminder 32404 Pacific Grove Court Union City, California 94587 / US | ||
02 /
LEE, Eun Soo 2575 Hampton Avenue Redwood City, California 94062 / US | |||
03 /
SAGI, Appala 146 Madison Avenue, No. 6 Redwood City, California 94061 / US | |||
04 /
FELDSTEIN, Mikhail M. Leninsky Prospekt 102, Apt. 145 Moscow, 119415 / RU | |||
05 /
BAIRAMOV, Danir F. 257 Arriba Drive, No. 1 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Joos, Uta Susanne, et al Braun GmbH Patentabteilung Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2010/23] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06719793.9 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006US03091 | Priority number, date | US20050648093P | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 648093 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081497 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1843798 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/44, A61L15/58 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
A61L15/44 (EP,US);
A61B5/259 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61L15/585 (EP,US);
A61N1/0456 (EP,US);
A61N1/0468 (EP,US);
A61N1/0496 (EP,US);
A61L2300/402 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/412 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (EP,US);
A61N1/0428 (EP,US);
A61N1/0444 (EP,US);
A61N1/0448 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/585, C08L33/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHILE BIOKOMPATIBLE KLEBSTOFF FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2007/42] | English: | HYDROPHYLIC BIOCOMPATIBLE ADHESIVE FORMULATIONS AND USES | [2007/42] | French: | FORMULATIONS ET UTILISATIONS D'ADHESIFS HYDROPHILES BIOCOMPATIBLES | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5730999 (LEHMANN KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,15,16,20-25,31,33,34 * column 2, line 27 - line 43 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 17 * * column 5, line 5 - line 25 * * column 5, line 40 - line 48 * * examples 1-12 * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 1-34; | [DX]US5846558 (NIELSEN KENT E [CA], et al) [DX] 1-8,15,16,20-25,31,33,34 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 36 * * column 3, line 46 - line 62 * * column 11, line 19 - line 56 * * column 12, line 10 - line 33 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-28 *; | [X]US6063399 (ASSMUS MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,15,16,20-25,31,33,34 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 13 * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 39 * * column 4, line 45 - line 67 * * column 5, line 1 - line 24 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO0069421 (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [X]US6461636 (ARTH CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,15,16,20-25,31,33,34 * column 2, line 11 - line 51 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 43 * * column 5, line 1 - line 42 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 23 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-8 *; | [DY]US2003152528 (SINGH PARMINDER [US], et al) [DY] 1-34 * page 2, paragraph 23 - page 3, paragraph 24 * * page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 4, paragraph 55 - page 5, paragraph 59 * * page 5, paragraph 62 * * page 5, paragraph 63 - page 6, paragraph 67 * * page 7, paragraph 82 - page 8, paragraph 83 * |