EP1846596 - METHOD OF MAKING SUBSTITUTIONALLY CARBON-HIGHLY DOPED CRYSTALLINE SI-LAYERS BY CVD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM America, Inc. 3440 East University Drive Phoenix, AZ 85034-7200 / US | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Matthias 7205 South Golfside Lane Phoenix, Arizona 85042 / US | 02 /
WEEKS, Keith, Doran 730 S. Golden Key Gilbert, Arizona 85233 / US | 03 /
TOMASINI, Pierre 1445 E. Broadway Road Unit 214 Tempe, Arizona 85281 / US | 04 /
CODY, Nyles 1395 W. Maria Lane Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
BAUER, Matthias 7205 South Golfside Lane Phoenix, Arizona 85042 / US | ||
02 /
WEEKS, Keith, Doran 730 S. Golden Key Gilbert, Arizona 85233 / US | |||
03 /
TOMASINI, Pierre 1150 W. University Drive Tempe, Arizona 85281 / US | |||
04 /
CODY, Nyles 1395 W. Maria Lane Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | Representative(s) | polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06720025.3 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006US03465 | Priority number, date | US20050649990P | 04.02.2005 Original published format: US 649990 P | US20050663434P | 18.03.2005 Original published format: US 663434 P | US20050668420P | 04.04.2005 Original published format: US 668420 P | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006083909 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1846596 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/06, C30B25/02, C23C16/24, H01L29/10, H01L21/205 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H01L29/7848 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/04 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/22 (EP,US);
C23C16/24 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/32 (EP,US);
C23C16/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45512 (EP,KR,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,KR,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02529 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02576 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02598 (KR);
H01L21/0262 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02636 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02639 (EP,US);
H01L21/32055 (KR);
H01L21/32056 (EP,US);
H01L21/3215 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/165 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66628 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66636 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7834 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/20] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENSTOFF-SUBSTITUTIONSDOTIERTEN KRISTALLINEN SI-SCHICHTEN DURCH CVD | [2007/43] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING SUBSTITUTIONALLY CARBON-HIGHLY DOPED CRYSTALLINE SI-LAYERS BY CVD | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE MATERIAUX CONTENANT DU SI CRISTALLIN SUBSTITUTIONNELLEMENT DOPE AU CARBONE PAR DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 07.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002168868 (TODD MICHAEL A [US]) [Y] 22-47 * paragraph [0046]; claims 1-7,25,33; table 1 *; | [X]US2004262694 (CHIDAMBARAM PR [US]) [X] 48-52 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2005023520 (LEE MIN-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 48-52* the whole document *; | [DXY] - J. HOYT, Substitutional Carbon Incorporation and Electronic Characterization of Si1-yCy/Si Heterojunctions" in "SILICON-GERMANIUM ALLOY, NEW YORK, US, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS BOOKS, (2002), XP008065143 [DX] 1-7,10-21 * page 59 - page 89 * [Y] 22-47 | [X] - YAGI S ET AL, "Substitutional C incorporation into Si1-yCy alloys using novel carbon source, 1,3-disilabutane", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1 (REGULAR PAPERS, SHORT NOTES & REVIEW PAPERS) JAPAN SOC. APPL. PHYS JAPAN, (200407), vol. 43, no. 7A, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 4153 - 4154, XP002385977 [X] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.43.4153 |