EP1849207 - DUAL MODE CERAMIC FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies S.a.r.l. 296-298 Route de Longwy 1940 Luxembourg City / LU | ||
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states P-Wave Holdings, LLC 10877 Wilshire Boulevard 18th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies, Inc. 1801 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREASSON, Krister Fleminggaten 91 S-112 45 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
POSHMAN, Goran Nyponvagen 4 S-186 45 Vallentuna / SE | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/41] |
Former [2007/44] | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB, Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06720451.1 | 08.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US04338 | Priority number, date | US20050651182P | 09.02.2005 Original published format: US 651182 P | US20060349463 | 07.02.2006 Original published format: US 349463 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006086414 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849207 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849207 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/20, H01P7/10, H01P1/208 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
H01P7/105 (EP,US);
H01P1/2086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/44] | H01P1/20, H01P7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/41] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KERAMISCHER FILTER MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN | [2017/44] | English: | DUAL MODE CERAMIC FILTER | [2007/44] | French: | FILTRE CERAMIQUE BIMODE | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/44] | KERAMISCHES FILTER MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2014 | 28.02.2018 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2006 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IE | 08.02.2019 | LU | 08.02.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5638037 (KURISU TORU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5710530 (WADA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US6650208 (KARHU KIMMO KALERVO [FI]) | Examination | JPH0865005 | DE10214895 | US4642591 |