EP1866426 - PREPARATION OF SLOWLY DIGESTIBLE CARBOHYDRATES BY SSMB CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/51] | PREPARATION OF SLOWLY DIGESTIBLE CARBOHYDRATES | ||
[2008/31] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tate & Lyle Ingredients Americas, Inc. 2200 E. Eldorado Street Decatur, IL 62521 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMAN, Andrew, J. 2200 East Eldorado Street Decatur, IL 62521 / US | 02 /
ARMENTROUT, Richard, W. 4828 Forrest Trail Decatur, IL 62521 / US | 03 /
LIU, Chi-Li 4643 Nicklaus Court Decatur, IL 62526 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Smyth, Gyles Darren Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Smyth, Gyles Darren Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06720921.3 | 22.02.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US06037 | Priority number, date | US20050083347 | 17.03.2005 Original published format: US 83347 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101648 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866426 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866426 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG LANGSAM VERDAUBARER KOHLENHYDRATE DURCH SSMB-CHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2008/31] | English: | PREPARATION OF SLOWLY DIGESTIBLE CARBOHYDRATES BY SSMB CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2008/31] | French: | PREPARATION DE GLUCIDES A DIGESTION LENTE PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE SSMB | [2008/31] |
Former [2007/51] | HERSTELLUNG LANGSAM VERDAUBARER KOHLENHYDRATE | ||
Former [2007/51] | PREPARATION OF SLOWLY DIGESTIBLE CARBOHYDRATES | ||
Former [2007/51] | PREPARATION DE GLUCIDES A DIGESTION LENTE | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR Opponent's representative Gallois, Valérie Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | 02
23.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Cargill Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata MN 55391 / US Opponent's representative Haegeman, Christophe Dominique René Cargill Europe BVBA Law-IP Department Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR Opponent's representative Gallois, Valérie Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand F-75002 Paris / FR | ||
02
23.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Cargill Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata MN 55391 / US Opponent's representative Haegeman, Christophe Dominique René Cargill Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | 29.10.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.03.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.12.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | BE | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | LT | 24.12.2008 | LV | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | IE | 22.02.2009 | LU | 22.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | IS | 24.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | GB | 22.02.2010 | IT | 22.02.2010 | PL | 22.02.2010 | RO | 22.02.2010 | SK | 22.02.2010 | ES | 23.02.2010 | HU | 23.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | DE | 01.09.2010 | [2020/33] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CY | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
LU | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2010 | ||
IT | 22.02.2010 | ||
PL | 22.02.2010 | ||
RO | 22.02.2010 | ||
SK | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CY | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
LU | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2010 | ||
IT | 22.02.2010 | ||
RO | 22.02.2010 | ||
SK | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
LU | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2010 | ||
IT | 22.02.2010 | ||
SK | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2010 | ||
IT | 22.02.2010 | ||
SK | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
DE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
SK | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
SK | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 24.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6406547 (DONOVAN MICHAEL [GB], et al) [Y] 8-11,13,15,20 * See the Abstract, column 8 (lines 30-56) *; | [A]US6663780 (HEIKKILA HEIKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1-23 * See column 2 (SSMB) and Claims 1, 29-30 *; | [XY] - GOULAS ET AL, "Purification of oligosaccharides by nanofiltration", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 209, pages 321 - 335, XP002384101 [X] 1-5,14,16-19,23 * See pages 321-322 (Abstract and Introduction) * [Y] 8-11,13,15,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(02)00362-9 | [XY] - GOULAS ET AL, "Fractionation of oligosaccharides by nanofiltration", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2003), vol. 83, pages 675 - 680, XP004382364 [X] 1-5,14,16-19,23 * See pages 675-676 (Introduction) and page 680 (Conclusions) * [Y] 8-11,13,15,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(02)00362-9 | [A] - BAUDOUIN ET AL, "Desugarization of low purity syrups and molasses: The sequential simulated moving bed (SSMB) is a new step of progress in the development of chromatographic separation for two fraction systems", CITS - INTERNATIONAL COMMISSION FOR SUGAR TECHNOLOGY - 22ND GENERAL ASSEMBLY, MAY 2003, MADRID, SPAIN, (2003), page 1, URL: http://www.cits-sugar.org/cits/cits_abstracts/26.htm, (20060607), XP002384235 [A] 1-23 * See the Abstract; SSMB as state of the art * | [A] - KANEKO ET AL, "Characterization of acid-stable glucose isomerase from Streptomyces sp., and development of single-step processes for high-fructose corn sweetener (HFCS) production", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 64, pages 940 - 947, XP002384236 [A] 1-23 * See page 940 (Introduction, left column) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.64.940 |