EP1875021 - ITEM OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARG, David Inselstrasse 5 A-6900 Bregenz / AT | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
KARG, David Ammianusstrasse 1 A-6900 Bregenz / AT | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 06721232.4 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006AT00175 | Priority number, date | AT20050000717 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: AT 7172005 | [2008/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113961 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1875021 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1875021 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/00, E05C19/16 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
E05F1/1066 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/21 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/22 (US);
E05Y2201/221 (EP);
E05Y2201/232 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖBEL | [2008/02] | English: | ITEM OF FURNITURE | [2008/02] | French: | MEUBLE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10009168.5 / EP2256271 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | GB | 28.04.2011 | LU | 28.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | FR | 02.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
GB | 28.04.2011 | ||
LU | 28.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
GB | 28.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1157149 (LYONNAISE ARTICLES METALL [FR]); | [A]US4978152 (BISBING ROBERT H [US]); | [A]US2004055221 (HOFFMANN LAWRENCE ANDREW [US]); | [X]DE202004007168U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [A]WO2004101919 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) | Examination | US1334712 |