EP1876920 - INTERDENTAL BRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weber, Magdalena Sariastrasse 9 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Michael Sariastrasse 9 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [2009/42] |
Former [2008/03] | 01 /
WEBER, Michael Sariastrasse 9 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06721233.2 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006AT00176 | Priority number, date | AT20050000742 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: AT 7422005 | AT20050000741 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: AT 7412005 | [2008/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006116784 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876920 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876920 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A46B7/04, A46B3/08 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
A46B7/04 (EP,US);
A46B2200/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERDENTALBÜRSTE | [2008/03] | English: | INTERDENTAL BRUSH | [2008/03] | French: | BROSSE INTERDENTAIRE | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IE | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | LV | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | LU | 28.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
LU | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | FI | 24.02.2010 | |
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4751761 (BREITSCHMID ULRICH [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0311937 (BUTLER JOHN O CO [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US5394584 (BREITSCHMID UELI [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5499420 (BOLAND BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10034367 (THIES HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0550118 | US5394584 | WO9606547 | DE10123814 |