EP1930166 - A DETACHABLE INK CARTRIDGE WITH A DISPLAY MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhuhai Nine Star Electronic Science and Technology A03 Dong Da Electronic City, 63 Mingzhubei Lu Xiangzhou District Zhuhai, Guangdong 519000 / CN | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Jun-Zhong A03 Unit, Dongda Electron City 63 Mingzhu Road North Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong 519000 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Yi A03 Unit, Dongda Electron City 63 Mingzhu Road North Xiangzhou District, Zhuhai Guangdong 519000 / CN | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06722091.3 | 21.03.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006CN00439 | Priority number, date | CN20052063887U | 30.08.2005 Original published format: CN 200520063887 U | [2008/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025422 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930166 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930166 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1930166 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSBARE TINTENPATRONE MIT ANZEIGEGLIED | [2008/24] | English: | A DETACHABLE INK CARTRIDGE WITH A DISPLAY MEMBER | [2008/24] | French: | CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE AMOVIBLE DOTEE D'UN ELEMENT D'AFFICHAGE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2006 | Translation filed | 24.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 02.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | BE | 26.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002175979 (MORITA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0176]; figures 3a,29,30,34a *; | [A]EP1348560 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1352748 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP1547781 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0033]; figures 3,5,9 *; | [A]EP1547783 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5847731 (KASHIMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US6375315 (STEINMETZ CHARLES R [US], et al); | [A]JP2002307723 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS); | [A]EP1547783 (CANON KK [JP]) |